Hoang et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Jerry Hoang and Le Uyen Thi Hoang
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Federal National Mortgage Association, Bank of America NA, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc and BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Case Number: 2:2017cv00874
Filed: June 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ANSWER to #72 Amended Complaint by Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc.(Stastny, Douglas)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 AMENDED MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES; Length of Trial: *3-4 days*. Jury Trial is set for 6/21/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 5/8/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/23/2020, Motions due by 1/22/2021, Discovery completed by 2/22/2021, Dispositive motions due by 3/23/2021, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 4/22/2021, Motions in Limine due by 5/10/2021, Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2021, Deposition Designations due by 6/2/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/14/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 6/14/2021, by Judge James L. Robart. (AD)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND, filed by Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang.(Stafne, Scott)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: The court GRANTS Plaintiffs' motion to amend (Dkt. #51 ) and authorizes Plaintiffs to file their amended complaint in the form attached as Exhibit 1 to the motion (Dkt. #51 -1) within four (4) days of the entry of the order. The court additionally DENIES Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. #55 ) and GRANTS summary judgment to Defendants on that issue. The court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Defendants' motion for summary judgment (Dkt. #46 ). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang, TO RESPONSE to #55 CROSS-MOTION re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Stafne, Scott)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE, by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, to #55 CROSS-MOTION re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. (Stastny, Douglas)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 DECLARATION of Scott E. Stafne filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang re #51 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Stafne, Scott)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang, TO RESPONSE to #51 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Stafne, Scott)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 DECLARATION of Douglas Stastny filed by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Stastny, Douglas)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 REPLY, filed by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, TO RESPONSE to #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Stastny, Douglas)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RESPONSE, by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, to #51 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint. (Stastny, Douglas)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 PRAECIPE to attach document (Corrected signature page) re #60 Declaration by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang (Stafne, Scott)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 PRAECIPE to attach document (Corrected signature page) re #59 Declaration by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang (Stafne, Scott)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The #59 and #60 Declarations were improperly signed by Declarants Jerry Hoang and Le Uyen Nguyen. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. Please file corrected signature pages using Praecipe to Attach event and link to original filings. (LH)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 DECLARATION of Scott E. Stafne filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Stafne, Scott)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 DECLARATION of Le Uyen Nguyen filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Stafne, Scott)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 DECLARATION of Jerry Hoang filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Stafne, Scott)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 RESPONSE, by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang, to #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Stafne, Scott)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 DECLARATION of Jerry Hoang filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang re #55 CROSS-MOTION re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Stafne, Scott)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 DECLARATION of Scott E. Stafne filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang re #55 CROSS-MOTION re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Stafne, Scott)
December 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 CROSS-MOTION re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment ., filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/22/2021, (Stafne, Scott)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent ICE Mortgage Services LLC for Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc (Stastny, Douglas)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #51 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Stafne, Scott)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 DECLARATION of Scott E. Stafne filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang re #51 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Stafne, Scott)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint Proposed Complaint and Exhibits) Noting Date 1/8/2021, (Stafne, Scott)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Charles T Meyer for Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Stastny, Douglas)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 DECLARATION of Susan E Magaddino filed by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Stastny, Douglas)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 DECLARATION of Noemi C. Garcia filed by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Stastny, Douglas)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 DECLARATION of Douglas C. Stastny filed by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc re #46 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Stastny, Douglas)
December 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION for Summary Judgment , filed by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 1/8/2021, (Stastny, Douglas)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *3-4 days*. Bench Trial is set for 6/21/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 5/8/2020, Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/23/2020, Motions due by 1/22/2021, Discovery completed by 2/22/2021, Dispositive motions due by 3/23/2021, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 4/22/2021, Motions in Limine due by 5/10/2021, Pretrial Order due by 6/1/2021, Deposition Designations due by 6/2/2021, Pretrial Conference set for 6/7/2021 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 6/14/2021, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 6/14/2021. (AD)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 SCHEDULING ORDER re parties' #42 Amended Second Stipulated Motion to Reschedule Order Setting Trial Dates. The Court has considered the parties stipulated motion to reschedule order setting trial dates and finding good cause GRANTS the motion. The Court will issue a new scheduling order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 PLEASE DISREGARD. CLERK TO REPOST THIS ORDER. ORDER re parties' #42 Amended Stipulated Motion to Reschedule Order Setting Trial Dates. Bench Trial is set for 10/5/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge James L. Robart, Amended Pleadings due by 4/8/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/8/2020, Motions related to discovery due by 5/8/2020, Discovery completed by 6/8/2020, Dispositive motions due by 7/7/2020, Agreed Pretrial Order due by 9/14/2020, Deposition designation must be submitted to the court (not filed on CM/ECF) by 9/16/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/28/2020. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) Modified on 4/10/2020 (PM).
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #43 Order on Stipulated Motion: DISREGARD docket entry #43 . Clerk to repost order directly without establishing deadlines. (PM)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Second Stipulated MOTION TO RESCHEDULE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATES, filed by Plaintiff Jerry Hoang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/9/2020, (Stafne, Scott)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying the parties' #40 stipulated motion to modify the court's scheduling order. If the parties wish to move to the end of the trial calendar, they should file a new stipulated motion to that effect within 14 days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Stipulated MOTION TO RESCHEDULE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATES, filed by Plaintiff Jerry Hoang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 4/17/2020, (Stafne, Scott)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES by Judge James L. Robart; Length of Trial: *3-4 days*. Bench Trial is set for 10/5/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 14106 before Judge James L. Robart. Joinder of Parties due by 7/8/2019, Amended Pleadings due by 4/8/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 4/8/2020, Motions due by 5/8/2020, Discovery completed by 6/8/2020, Dispositive motions due by 7/7/2020, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 8/6/2020, Motions in Limine due by 8/24/2020, Pretrial Order due by 9/14/2020, Deposition Designations due by 9/16/2020, Pretrial Conference set for 9/21/2020 at 02:30 PM before Judge James L. Robart. Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/28/2020, Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law to be submitted by 9/28/2020. (AD)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 3-4 days. (Stastny, Douglas)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER ON RESPONSE TO #33 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Parties are ordered to file a Joint Status Report no later than 6/3/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 DECLARATION of SCOTT E. STAFNE by Plaintiff Jerry Hoang (Stafne, Scott)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 DECLARATION of SCOTT E. STAFNE re #33 Order to Show Cause, by Plaintiff Jerry Hoang (Stafne, Scott)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Douglas C Stastny on behalf of Defendants BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP, Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.. (Stastny, Douglas)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SHOW CAUSE MINUTE ORDER - It is ORDERED that counsel show cause by May 10, 2019, why this action should not be dismissed for failing to comply with Order requiring Status Report signed March 26, 2019, and due April 25, 2019. Absent a timely response to this Order, the action SHALL BE DISMISSED without prejudice. (AD)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Scott E Stafne on behalf of Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang. (Stafne, Scott)
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Reset Deadlines: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is now due 4/10/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is now due 4/5/2019, Joint Status Report is now due 4/25/2019. (AD) cc: plaintiff via US mail
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT by Judge James L. Robart. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/1/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/5/2019, Joint Status Report due by 4/9/2019. (AD) cc: Plaintiffs via US mail
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #28 Motion for an order of substitution to proceed pro se. The Clerk is directed to terminate James A. Wexler and Jill J. Smith as counsel for Mr. Hoang and Ms. Hoang in this matter. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Plaintiffs via first class mail
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties (Meyer, Charles)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION for Substitution to Proceed as Pro Se, filed by Plaintiff Jerry Hoang. Noted by Clerk for 4/5/2019, (TH)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER FOLLOWING REMAND FROM THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS; vacating #16 Order Granting Defendants Bank of America, NA and Federal National Mortgage Association's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint ; parties are to file a Joint Status Report within 14 days of the date of this Order ; granting Jerry Hoang an order of substitution to proceed pro se per Mr. Hoang's #25 Notice of Appearance ; the court ORDERS Ms. Hoang to either (1) appoint another attorney, or (2) seek an order of substitution to proceed pro se. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) Attorneys Jill J. Smith and James A. Wexler terminated as to Jerry Hoang. (cc: Jerry Hoang via USPS)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ANSWER to Complaint; Attorney Charles T. Meyer added to party Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Charles T. Meyer added to party BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP(pty:dft) by Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP.(Meyer, Charles)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance (pro se) by Plaintiff Jerry Hoang (SWT)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER of USCA (17-35993) as to #19 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang (CDA)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MANDATE of USCA (17-35993) as to #19 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang. The judgment of this Court, entered December 06, 2018, takes effect this date. This constitutes the formal mandate of this Court issued pursuant to Rule4 1(a) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. Costs are taxed against the appellee in the amount of $112.70 REVERSE AND REMAND(SG)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 OPINION of USCA (NOT THE MANDATE 17-35993) as to #19 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang. REVERSE AND REMAND (CDA)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER (17-35993) as to #19 Notice of Appeal filed by Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang (CDA)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jill J. Smith on behalf of Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang. (Smith, Jill)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit (17-35993) re #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #17 Judgment by Court by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang. Filing Fee $505, Receipt number 0981-5122919. (Smith, Jill) Modified on 12/11/2017 to add CCA # (CDA).
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 **DUPLICATE ENTRY** NOTICE OF APPEAL to Ninth Circuit re #16 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #17 Judgment by Court by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang. (Smith, Jill) Modified on 12/11/2017 see Docket no #19 Notice of Appeal (CDA).
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT BY COURT: Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang and Le Uyen Thi Nguyen's complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice (Order (Dkt. #16 )). (SWT)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting defendants' #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY, filed by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, TO RESPONSE to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Varallo, Christopher)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 REPLY, filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang, TO RESPONSE to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Wexler, James)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #9 Motion for extension of time to respond to the #4 Motion to dismiss. Response due 7/31/2017; Motion to dismiss #4 is re-noted for 8/4/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart (PM)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 DECLARATION of Christopher G. Varallo re #11 Response to Order to Show Cause by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Varallo, Christopher)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association (Varallo, Christopher)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 RESPONSE, by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association, to #9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Motion. (Varallo, Christopher)
July 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Noting Date Reset at the direction of chambers re Plaintiffs' MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Motion (Dkt. #9 ): Noting Date 7/14/2017. (AD)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply Motion, filed by Plaintiffs Jerry Hoang, Le Uyen Thi Hoang. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) Noting Date 6/30/2017, (Wexler, James)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Varallo, Christopher)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/7/2017, by Judge James L. Robart. (RS)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Bank of America Corporation for Bank of America NA. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association (Varallo, Christopher)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 DECLARATION of Christopher G. Varallo filed by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Varallo, Christopher)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants Bank of America NA, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/7/2017, (Varallo, Christopher)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) Bank of America, N.A. and Federal National Mortgage Association must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6/15/2017. (RE)
June 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Judge James L. Robart added. (RE)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFFS re #1 Notice of Removal, ; filed by Defendants Bank of America, N.A., Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Notice of State Court Clerk of Removal to Federal Court)(Varallo, Christopher)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 17-2-11754-4 SEA; (Receipt # 0981-4901546) Attorney Christopher G. Varallo added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher G. Varallo added to party Federal National Mortgage Association(pty:dft), filed by Federal National Mortgage Association, Bank of America, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Varallo, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hoang et al v. Bank of America, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Christopher G. Varallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Charles T Meyer
Represented By: Douglas C Stastny
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Christopher G. Varallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America NA
Represented By: Charles T Meyer
Represented By: Douglas C Stastny
Represented By: Steven Joseph Dixson
Represented By: Christopher G. Varallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Represented By: Charles T Meyer
Represented By: Douglas C Stastny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BAC Home Loans Servicing, LP
Represented By: Charles T Meyer
Represented By: Douglas C Stastny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Hoang
Represented By: James A. Wexler
Represented By: Scott E Stafne
Represented By: Jill J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Le Uyen Thi Hoang
Represented By: James A. Wexler
Represented By: Scott E Stafne
Represented By: Jill J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?