Anderson v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Inge T. Anderson
Defendant: United States of America, United States Air Force and Scott Alan Anderson
Case Number: 2:2017cv00891
Filed: June 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Clallam
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF PARTIAL JUDGMENT ON REMAND by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter an independent partial judgment in favor of plaintiff and against defendant on the breach of contract claim in the additional sum of $9,172, for prejudgment interest of $21.49 on that amount, and for post-judgment interest at the rate of.07% per annum from the date of the independent partial judgment until the amount is paid in full. (KERR)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's 201 Motion to Retax: The Clerk of Court is directed to enter a second amended judgment reflecting an award of costs in the total amount of $1,973.64. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER granting Defendant's 202 Motion for Extension of Time to File Appeal: Because plaintiff's opening brief on appeal is due on 3/4/2020, defendant shall file his notice of cross-appeal no later than 3/2/2020. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER DIRECTING ENTRY OF JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of plaintiff and against the garnishee defendant: On the breach of contract claim in the sum of $15,358.00 for all amounts due and owing through 12/31/2019; For attorney's fees in the amount of $8,360.50; For prejudgment interest accrued on or before 1/14/2020, in the amount of $139.33; For post-judgment interest at the rate of 1.53 &# 037; per annum from 1/15/2020, until the judgment is paid in full; and on the specific performance claim as set forth in the Court's orders at Dkt. # 166 and # 184 . Within seven days of the receipt of the judgment amount, plaintiff shall file a notice of satisfaction of the monetary judgment in the above-captioned matter. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER: In order to determine plaintiff's income since the date the jury entered its verdict, the Court requires a statement, under penalty of perjury, that reflects plaintiff's good faith effort to identify her income, as defined above, between 7/16/2019, and the date of the statement. Plaintiff shall complete the form attached at Exhibit A and file it with the Court within seven days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (MW)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 180 Motion for Payment Arrangements. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 168 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 158 Motion for New Trial; granting Plaintiff's 159 Motion for Leave to File Over-length Motions and Briefs. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER regarding defendant Scott Anderson's response to one of plaintiff's requests for sanctions, Dkt. 121 ; denying reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER limiting Defendant's witnesses and exhibits. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 112 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. The issues for a protective order and entry of judgment re: 112 Emergency Motion for TRO and Protective Order are renoted for 6/21/2019; Opposition due by noon, on Wednesday, June 19, 2019; Reply due by midnight on the note date. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting Defendant's 96 Motion for Leave to Amend or Withdraw Responses. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(MW)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER appointing US Magistrate Judge Michelle Peterson as settlement judge. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: CRD for MLP)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting in part defendant's 86 Motion for Leave to Amend Answer and Counterclaim. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying plaintiff's 83 Motion for Discovery Sanctions. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER denying defendant's 79 Motion to Compel Deposition. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting defendant's 74 Motion to Quash Subpoena for Wells Fargo Bank; granting in part defendant's 75 Motion to Quash Subpoena for Scott Alan Anderson. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER re Plaintiff's 41 Motion to Dismiss Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
November 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Regarding Pending Discovery Motions (Dkts. 44 , 46 , 48 , 58 ). Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 36 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The discovery deadline is hereby extended to November 6, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting plaintiff's 27 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; 25 Amended Complaint is now the operative pleading; defendant has fourteen days from the date of this order to respond to the amended complaint, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, as to plaintiff, within seven days of the date of this Order why the 25 Amended Complaint should not be stricken, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting Defendants United States and United States Air Force's 17 Motion to Dismiss, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (United States Air Force and United States of America terminated.)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Lt. Col. Anderson's 13 Motion to dismiss. Plaintiff's breach of contract claim against this defendant may proceed. Her negligence and outrage claims are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Inge T. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Air Force
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Alan Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?