Hover et al v. GMAC Mortgage Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Lynn Dale Hover and Mila Jean Hover
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage Corporation, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Federal Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae), Nationstar Mortgage LLC, Northwest Trustee Services Inc and John or Jane Does
Case Number: 2:2017cv00902
Filed: June 12, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Joshua Schaer is withdrawn as counsel for Defendant Northwest Trustee Services, Inc. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc plaintiffs and NWTS via first class mail
October 3, 2017 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant Northwest Trustee Services Inc's 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting Defendant GMAC Mortgage Corporation's 17 Motion to Dismiss Ditech Financial LLC; granting Defendants Federal Mortgage Association's, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc's, and Nationstar Mortgage LLC's 19 Motion to Dismiss; this case is now CLOSED, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiffs via USPS)
September 19, 2017 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING UNTIMELY RESPONSES the Court hereby STRIKES Plaintiffs' responses 34 and 35 to the pending motions to dismiss filed by Defendants Fannie Mae, MERS, Nationstar Mortgager LLC, Bank of America, N.A., and Ditech Financial, and the Court will not consider those responses in reviewing Defendants' motions by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (RS) cc plaintiffs
September 15, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting parties' 25 Joint MOTION to Amend 6 Joint Status Report Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(TH) (cc: Plaintiffs)
August 9, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting dfts Nationstar Mortgage, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems and Federal National Mortgage Assoc's 10 Motion for Extension of Time to 8/16/17 to Answer signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) Modified on 8/9/2017/cc plaintiffs (RS).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hover et al v. GMAC Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Dale Hover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mila Jean Hover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Mortgage Association (Fannie Mae)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwest Trustee Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John or Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?