Delisle et al v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Arthur Delisle and Myong Delisle
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv00905
Filed: June 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Dismissal with Prejudice re parties' 23 Stipulated Motion. This case is dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to either party. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
August 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend deadlines re parties' 20 Stipulated Motion; Discovery deadline EXTENDED to 7/15/2018; Settlement deadline EXTENDED to 8/31/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik.(SWT)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION AND ORDER to File First Amended Complaint signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delisle et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Delisle
Represented By: Sok-Khieng K Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myong Delisle
Represented By: Sok-Khieng K Lim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?