White et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Inc et al
Plaintiff: Ronald White and Phyllis White
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Inc, MERS, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC and The Bank of New York Mellon FKA the Bank of New York, as trustee for the certificate holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-26
Case Number: 2:2017cv00906
Filed: June 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal with prejudice re parties' 17 Stipulation/Proposed Order (Unsigned), signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Phyllis White via USPS)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER LIFTING STAY; Clerk shall REISSUE the Court's Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Joint Status Report with new deadlines, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff Phyllis White, Bankruptcy Trustee via USPS)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STAYING CASE, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Phyllis White, Bankruptcy Trustee via USPS)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying plaintiffs' 4 Motion for TRO signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) clerk emailed copy to plaintiffs
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Mortgage Electronic Registration Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Inc
Represented By: Tara J Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Tara J Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon FKA the Bank of New York, as trustee for the certificate holders of the CWABS, Inc., Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2006-26
Represented By: Tara J Schleicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?