Ray v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Sue Ray
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv00907
Filed: June 13, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 1, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re plaintiff's 19 Notice of Delay. The Court CONTINUES Oral Argument to 7/19/2018 at 10:30 AM . The pending cross-motions (dkt. nos. 10 , 11 ) are RENOTED to 7/19/2018. The deadline for plaintiff to file under seal and serve the materials described in 18 Minute Order is EXTENDED to 6/29/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 22, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER setting Oral Argument on pending cross-motions for summary judgment, dkt nos. 11 , 10 : Motion Hearing set for 6/27/2018 at 01:30 PM ; RENOTING cross-motions, dkt no. 10 , 11 : Noting Date 6/27/2018. Defendant shall prov ide to the Court a courtesy copy of the administrative record on or before 5/25/2018. Plaintiff shall provide to defendant's attorney a copy of her application under seal. (See Minute Order for details) Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 16, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 13 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time; RENOTING parties' cross-motions, Dkts. 11 and 10 , to 3/30/2018; STRIKING bench trial date and all other remaining dates and deadlines. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 21, 2017 9 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting defendant's 8 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Dispositive Motions; Defendant shall file any motion for summary judgment, not to exceed twenty (20) pages in length, on or before January 19, 2018, and shall note such motion for March 23, 2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 14, 2017 6 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES: Bench Trial (1/2 day) is set for 5/30/2018 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Deadline for filing administrative record is 9/6/2017, Dispositive motions due by 1/5/2018, Pretrial Order due by 5/11/2018, Pretrial Conference set for 5/18/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 5/11/2018, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 5/11/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sue Ray
Represented By: R Darrin Class
Represented By: Christopher E Roy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?