G.O. America Shipping Company, Inc. v. China Cosco Shipping Corporation Limited et al

Plaintiff: G.O. America Shipping Company, Inc.
Defendant: China Cosco Shipping Corporation Limited, China Shipping Industry, Cosco Shipping Heavy Industry Co. and Cosco Shipping Lines Co., Ltd.
Claimant: COSCO Atlantic Shipping Ltd.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00912
Filed: June 13, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX Outside US
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant COSCO Atlantic Shipping Ltd.'s 70 Motion to Dismiss and/or to Vacate Rule B Attachment. This matter is dismissed with prejudice. Ordered that the remainder of the motions pending are dismissed as moot re: 53 Motion for Increased Amount of Security for Costs and 64 Motion to Stay Execution of Process and Set Surety Bond Amount and Language. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
August 3, 2017 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 57 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
July 14, 2017 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Special Claimant's 20 Emergency Motion to Vacate Maritime Attachment; re 8 Order and Process of Attachment, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc: USMO)
July 6, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING AMOUNT AND TERMS OF SPECIAL BOND AND AUTHORIZING RELEASE VESSEL granting 25 Motion for Bond signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) 3 cert copies USMO
June 29, 2017 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 12 Motion for appointment of substitute custodian and permitting movement of vessel, offloading of cargo and inspection of defendant vessel signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS) cc USMO cert copies
June 14, 2017 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plainitff's 3 Motion for Rule B Attachment; plaintiff's motion to appoint special process server 3 is denied as moot signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G.O. America Shipping Company, Inc. v. China Cosco Shipping Corporation Limited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G.O. America Shipping Company, Inc.
Represented By: Edward C Chung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Cosco Shipping Corporation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: China Shipping Industry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosco Shipping Heavy Industry Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cosco Shipping Lines Co., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: COSCO Atlantic Shipping Ltd.
Represented By: Molly J. Henry
Represented By: Philip Raoul Lempriere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?