Todd R. et al v. Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska
Plaintiff: Todd R., Suzanne R. and Lillian R.
Defendant: Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska
Case Number: 2:2017cv01041
Filed: July 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER FOLLOWING 89 REMAND FROM THE NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS. The court ORDERS the parties to file, within 14 days of the filing date of this order, a joint status report proposing how the court should proceed on remand along with a proposed case schedule. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CONSENT ORDER Staying Execution Pending Appeal re 83 Proposed Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying Defendant's 52 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting Plaintiffs' 56 Motion for Attorney's Fees ; granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' 61 Motion for Entry of Judgment and an Award of Prejudgment Interest. Proposed judgment or competing proposed judgments due no later than seven (7) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting defendant's 70 Motion to Seal Exhibits 6-7 to Declaration of Gwendolyn Payton. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER granting plaintiff's 62 Motion for Extension of Time: Plaintiffs shall file their information in support of their request for prejudgment interest by 3/8/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting defendant's 54 Motion to Seal Exhibits 4-5 to the Declaration of Gwendolyn Payton. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER directing Plaintiffs Todd R, Suzanne R., and Lillian R. to respond to Defendant Premera's 52 MOTION for Reconsideration. Response due 3/1/2019. Reply due 3/8/2019. The 52 Motion for Reconsideration is re-noted for 3/8/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW and ORDER denying Defendant's 33 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Plaintiffs' 37 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT)
January 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER scheduling Oral Argument on parties' 37 , 33 MOTIONS for Summary Judgment : Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2019 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Striking Trial Date. If necessary following the court's resolution of the parties' cross-motions, the court will reschedule the trial date. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Plaintiff's unopposed 41 Motion to Extend Deadline for Opposition Memorandum re: 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment, re: 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Response brief due 10/31/2018; Reply briefs due 11/14/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting parties' 39 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time; RENOTING plaintiffs' 37 MOTION for Summary Judgment, defendants' 33 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Noting Date 11/9/2018, signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting Defendant's 35 Motion to Seal the Administrative Record 36 . Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' unopposed 28 Motion for Amendment to Minute Order 26 . Opening Briefs due by 9/14/2018, Response Briefs due 10/15/2018; Reply Briefs due 10/28/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Todd R. et al v. Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd R.
Represented By: Brian S. King(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John Walker Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Suzanne R.
Represented By: Brian S. King(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John Walker Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian R.
Represented By: Brian S. King(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: John Walker Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska
Represented By: Timothy C. Houpt
Represented By: Gwendolyn C. Payton
Represented By: Jessica P. Wilde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?