Pamfile v. USA Secretary of Health and Human Services
Plaintiff: Catalin Pamfile
Defendant: USA Secretary of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 2:2017cv01059
Filed: July 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER re case closed. On August 16, 2017, the Court issued an Order in this case finding and ordering that this matter is DISMISSED. Dkt. # 13 . On September 1, 2017, this Order was affirmed by the Honorable Ronald B. Leighton, United States D istrict Judge. Dkt. # 14 . Plaintiff has subsequently filed several letters and exhibits on the record. See Dkts. # 15 through # 20 . The Court will not entertain any further requests related to the dismissed claims in this case, and will not review exhibits or letters related to those claims. Authorized by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 12 MOTION and declaration to change the judge ; referring this Order to Judge Leighton for review ; dismissing this matter, signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Failure to file this Response will result in dismissal of this case. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. James P. Donohue.(RS) cc plaintiff
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pamfile v. USA Secretary of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catalin Pamfile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA Secretary of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?