United States of America v. The Real Property Commonly Known as 101 West Hermosa Drive, San Gabriel, California 91775 et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: The Real Property Commonly Known as 101 West Hermosa Drive, San Gabriel, California 91775, All funds contained in Wells Fargo account number XXXXXX4582 and All funds contained in Bank of America account number XXXXXXXX9392
Case Number: 2:2017cv01138
Filed: July 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER re the Government's 21 Status Report. All proceedings in this matter remain STAYED until the related criminal case, United States v. Shelburne, et al., CR17-0203-JCC, is resolved, either through a verdict or guilty pleas. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re the Government's 19 Status Report. All proceedings in this matter remain STAYED until the related criminal case, United States v. Shelburne, et al., CR17-0203-JCC, is resolved, either through a verdict or guilty pleas. The United States shall file a status report no later than six months from the date of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re Government's 17 Status Report. All proceedings in this matter remain STAYED until the related criminal case, United States v. Shelburne, et al., CR17-0203-JCC, is resolved, either through a verdict or guilty pleas. The United States is DIRECTED to file a status report in six months from the date of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Stay. All proceedings in this case are STAYED until its companion criminal case, United States v. Shelburne, et al., CR17-0203-JCC, is resolved, either through a verdict or by way of plea. The United States is DIRECTED to file a status report in six months from the date of this order. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. The Real Property Commonly Known as 101 West Hermosa Drive, San Gabriel, California 91775 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Neal B Christiansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Real Property Commonly Known as 101 West Hermosa Drive, San Gabriel, California 91775
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds contained in Wells Fargo account number XXXXXX4582
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All funds contained in Bank of America account number XXXXXXXX9392
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?