Syria v. AllianceOne Receivables Management Inc et al
Plaintiff: Dana Syria
Defendant: AllianceOne Receivables Management Inc, EGS Financial Care Inc and Transworld Systems Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01139
Filed: July 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice plaintiff's 82 Motion for Preliminary Approval of a Class Action Settlement. Any renewed motion for preliminary approval of a class action settlement shall be filed within 70 days of the date of this Minute Order. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT) Modified filed date on 8/29/2018 (SWT).
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER granting Defendant AllianceOne's 69 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking Defendant AllianceOne's 53 Motion to Decertify the Class; striking Defendant AllianceOne's 55 Motion to Bifurcate and Stay the Class Claims; STRIKING the hearing set for 8/2/2018 at 9:00 AM; directing the Clerk to enter partial judgment in favor of AllianceOne and against plaintiff. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)(AllianceOne Receivables Management Inc terminated.)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MINUTE ORDER granting in part, striking in part, and deferring in part Defendant AllianceOne Receivables Management, Inc.'s 69 MOTION for Summary Judgment . Plaintiff's claim for remedies is hereby DISMISSED based on plaintiff& #039;s withdrawal of the claim. Defendant's evidentiary objections contained in its Reply, docket no. 75 , are STRICKEN. Defendant's request to strike notice of "supplemental authority" filed by plaintiff, docket no. 77 , is GRA NTED. The motion is otherwise DEFERRED. The Court SETS oral argument on the following motions for Thursday, August 2, 2018, at 9:00 AM: Defendant AllianceOne Receivables Management, Inc.'s Motion to Bifurcate and Stay Class Claims, docket no. [5 5]; Defendant AllianceOne Receivables Management, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment, docket no. 69 ; and Plaintiff's Motion to Certify Questions of State Law to the Washington Supreme Court, docket no. 79 . Although the King County Sup erior Court previously certified a class in this case (based on plaintiff's motion in state court, docket no. 11-13), the court's ruling was contingent upon plaintiff's counsel submitting proposed findings of fact and conclusions of la w. Because this case was then removed, plaintiff's counsel never submitted and the King County Superior Court never entered findings and conclusions and explained its ruling. Thus, that court failed to make any record as to the factors supportin g a class action or the manner in which it weighed the benefits of a class action suit. Although the state court might have had a tenable basis for a class action ruling, the record is insufficient to determine the previous ruling. As a result, this Court will not enter findings or conclusions on the previous state court ruling. Rather, the Court treats Defendant AllianceOne Receivables Management, Inc.'s Motion to Decertify Class, docket no. 53 , and plaintiff's opposition, as a new Motion to Certify Class. The Court will consider each pleading filed in state court relating to the motion to certify, as well as each pleading filed in connection with the motion to decertify, in connection with deciding whether a class should be certified. The Court also sets oral argument on the new Motion to Certify Class for Thursday, August 2, 2018, at 9:00 AM. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING defendant AllianceOne Receivables Management, Inc.'s 55 MOTION to Bifurcate and Stay Class Claims, 53 MOTION to Decertify Class ; Noting Date 5/25/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER LIFTING STAY. Within twenty-eight (28) days of the date of this Minute Order, counsel shall meet and confer and submit a Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan. The Court DECLINES to reinstate defendant AllianceOne Receivables Management, Inc.'s 44 Motion for Clarification. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MINUTE ORDER re plaintiff's 42 Petition for Permission to Appeal Minute Order. This case is STAYED pending further order of the Court; striking Defendant AllianceOne Receivables Management, Inc.'s 44 Motion for Clarification on Class S tatus; striking deadlines set forth in Order regarding Initial Disclosures (dkt. 43 ); directing parties to file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days after the USCA rules on petition for permission to appeal or 3/30/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's 18 Motion to Remand; denying as moot plaintiff's and defendant Transworld Systems Inc.'s 36 MOTION for Reconsideration. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING plaintiff's 36 MOTION for Reconsideration; Noting Date 11/10/2017, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER STAYING CASE; Plaintiff's motion to remand, docket no. 18 , in which defendant Transworld Systems, Inc. has joined, docket no. 22 , is DEFERRED; parties are DIRECTED to file a Joint Status Report within fourteen (14) days after the Ninth Circuit rules on AllianceOne's petition for permission to appeal or by June 29, 2018, whichever occurs earlier. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Syria v. AllianceOne Receivables Management Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana Syria
Represented By: Jason D Anderson
Represented By: Adam J Berger
Represented By: Lindsay Halm
Represented By: Thomas Tyler Santiago
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AllianceOne Receivables Management Inc
Represented By: Marc Rosenberg
Represented By: Donna M Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EGS Financial Care Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Transworld Systems Inc
Represented By: Seann C Colgan
Represented By: Emily J Harris
Represented By: Damian Patrick Richard
Represented By: Mallory L. Satre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?