In re: F/V Destination, Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01167
Filed: August 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:183
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Disbursing Funds from Court Registry signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Finance)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER re Plaintiff's 20 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re Petitioner's 17 Status Report. Limitation Petitioner shall advise the Court of the status of the release of all claims by the deceased crew with dependent minor children on or before May 31, 2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re Petitioner's 15 Status Report. If Limitation Petitioner has not filed a voluntary dismissal by March 31, 2018, it shall advise the Court at that time of the status of the release of claims in this action. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting petitioner's 12 Report/Motion to Hold Action in Abeyance; Limitation Petitioner shall advise Court of the status of settlement of claims on or before 2/5/2018, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting Petitioner's re 10 Report/Motion to Hold the Action in Abeyance; Status of the settlement of the claims due by 1/3/2018, by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Limitation Petitioner's 6 Report/Motion to Hold Action in Abeyance; On or before October 31, 2017, Limitation Petitioner shall advise the Court of the status of the settlement of the claims by the deceased crew with dependent minor children. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting Limitation Petitioner's 4 Motion to hold the action in abeyance; on or before 9/30/17, Limitation Petitioner shall advise court of the status of the settlement signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(RS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: F/V Destination, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?