Puget Soundkeeper Alliance et al v. Cargill Inc
Plaintiff: Puget Soundkeeper Alliance and RE Sources For Sustainable Communities
Defendant: Cargill Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01188
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365 Environmental Matters
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CONSENT DECREE re parties' 13 Joint Stipulated Motion, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER vacating 11 Order of Dismissal; directing clerk to reopen the matter on the Court's docket, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why sanctions including dismissal should not be imposed for failure to comply with the 6 Order; Show Cause Response due by 12/8/2017, Joint Status Report due by 12/8/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER per 7 Stipulation, Defendant Cargill Inc. is granted an additional 21 days to file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's complaint. Responsive pleading due 10/31/2017. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puget Soundkeeper Alliance et al v. Cargill Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puget Soundkeeper Alliance
Represented By: Katherine E Brennan
Represented By: Richard Adam Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RE Sources For Sustainable Communities
Represented By: Katherine E Brennan
Represented By: Richard Adam Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?