Puget Sound Surgical Center v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Puget Sound Surgical Center, PS
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company, Aetna Inc., Amtrak Health Care Plan, Anchorage School District Active Employee Open Choice PPO Medical Plan, Bechtel Jacobs Company LLC Health and Welfare Plan, State of Alaska AlaskaCare Employee Health Plan, Bank of America Health Care Plan, Nordstrom, Inc. Classic Plan, Starbucks Health Care Plan, Costco Wholesale Health Plan, Sound Health and Wellness Trust Plan, Westco Health Plan, Lockheed Martin Corporation Total Health Plan and Adobe Systems, Inc. Group Welfare Plan
Case Number: 2:2017cv01190
Filed: August 7, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal re Parties' 100 Stipulated Motion. The above referenced action, and all claims made therein, are dismissed with prejudice, and without an award of costs or attorneys' fees to any party. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (LH)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER re parties' 96 Motion to Dismiss Party. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendants Bechtel Jacobs Company LLC Health and Welfare Plan and Defendant Adobe Systems, Inc. Group Welfare Plan are dismissed, with prejudice and without attorneys' fees or costs to any of the parties. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying parties' 88 Stipulated Motion to Continue Deadlines. If the parties agree on alternative, they should so inform the court within seven days of the filing date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue discovery cut-off deadline re parties' 86 Stipulated Motion: Discovery completed by 6/7/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 5/30/2019, Motions due by 6/11/2019, signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant Sound Health's 70 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing Plaintiff's complaint against Defendant Sound Health without prejudice and with leave to amend to file an amended complaint within 14 days of the filing date of the order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(SWT)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Trial Date and Amend Case Schedule re parties' 75 Stipulated Motion: Jury Trial (5 days) is set for 9/16/2019; Amended Pleadings due by 3/20/2019, Discovery completed by 4/1/2019, Dispositive moti ons due by 6/18/2019, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 3/20/2019, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 9/30/2018, Motions due by 4/19/2019, Motions in Limine due by 7/29/2019, Pretrial Order due by 8/19/2019, Attorney settlement conference to be held by 7/29/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 9/9/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 9/9/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 02:30 PM. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER re: 68 Stipulated Joint Motion to Set Briefing Schedule. Defendants have 30 days from filing of status report to answer or respond to Complaint; Plaintiff has 30 days to file opposition if Defendant files motion to dismiss; Defendant's reply to motion to dismiss due 15 days from filing of any opposition. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re: 65 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 63 Stipulated motion for Protective Order without prejudice to re-filing in a manner that comports with LCR 26(c)(2). Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting Defendant Anchorage School District Active Employee Open Choice PPO Medical Plans 27 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. The court also denies PSSC's request to conduct jurisdictional discovery and ASD Plan's request for fees. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 STIPULATION AND ORDER re parties' 58 Stipulated MOTION BETWEEN PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT SOUND HEALTH TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING. The Court hereby extends the time for Sound Health to file an answer, motion, or other responsive pleading under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 to 21 days after service of the last defendant named in this proceeding. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
December 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting unopposed 53 Motion to File Sur-Reply to Anchorage School District Active Employee Open Choice PPO Medical Plan's 27 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 30 Motion for Extension of Time to file a Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. The court GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to respond to ASD Plan's m otion to dismiss (Dkt. # 30 ). The court DENIES the open-ended extension Plaintiff requests, but GRANTS a one-week extension from November 27, 2017, to December 4, 2017. The court also DIRECTS the Clerk to change the noting date for ASD Plan's motion to dismiss (Dkt. # 27 ) from December 1, 2017, to December 8, 2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Defendant's 13 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading. The court extends the time to file an answer, motion, or other responsive pleading under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 to 21 days after service of the last defendant named in this proceeding. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puget Sound Surgical Center v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puget Sound Surgical Center, PS
Represented By: Robert J Axelrod(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: D K Yoshida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrak Health Care Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anchorage School District Active Employee Open Choice PPO Medical Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel Jacobs Company LLC Health and Welfare Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Alaska AlaskaCare Employee Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Health Care Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordstrom, Inc. Classic Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Health Care Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Costco Wholesale Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sound Health and Wellness Trust Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westco Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation Total Health Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adobe Systems, Inc. Group Welfare Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?