Wilmington Savings Fund Society v. Fryberg et al
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society
Defendant: Corey Fryberg, American General Financial Services Inc, CFH Investments, First Heritage Bank, Tulalip Tribes of Washington and And Persons or Parties Unknown
Case Number: 2:2017cv01196
Filed: August 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting defendant Tulalip Tribes' 15 Motion to Dismiss. This case is DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why sanctions including dismissal should not be imposed for their failure to comply with the 16 , 20 Orders; Show Cause Response due by 12/8/2017, Joint Status Report due by 12/8/2017, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPLATION AND ORDER 0F CONTINUANCE OF MOTION TO DISMISS AND EXISITING DEADLINES re: 17 Motion. The 15 MOTION to Dismiss and Joint Status Report deadlines are continued by a week. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, on or before 8/25/2017, why the Court should not dismiss this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction by filing an amended complaint that adequately establishes federal jurisdiction, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society v. Fryberg et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society
Represented By: Kimberly Hood
Represented By: Craig Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corey Fryberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Financial Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CFH Investments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Heritage Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulalip Tribes of Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: And Persons or Parties Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?