American States Insurance Company et al v. Great American Insurance Company

Plaintiff: American States Insurance Company and First National Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv01200
Filed: August 9, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2018 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Counsel having notified the Court of settlement of this case, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this action and all claims asserted herein are DISMISSED without prejudice and without costs to any party. In the event that settlement is not perfected, any party may move to reopen the case within 60 days of the date of this order. Any trial date and pretrial dates previously set are hereby VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (KERR)
June 6, 2018 74 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Discovery Cutoff for Limited Purposes re parties' 70 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 30, 2018 69 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION ORDER to Continue Motion to Compel re parties' 68 Stipulated Motion; GAIC's Motion to Compel (dkt. 61 ) is continued to 6/15/2018. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 14, 2018 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plaintiffs' 48 Motion to Extend Expert Disclosure Deadline, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
April 10, 2018 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying parties requests to seal (Dkt. # 34 and Dkt. # 43 . The Clerk of Court is directed to unseal Dkt. # 37 . Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH)
March 6, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 32 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
March 2, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER to extend time re parties' 30 Stipulation; Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (dkt. 27 ) extended to 3/16/2018; Reply due 3/23/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 12, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court LETTER FROM COURT re parties' 25 Stipulation and Proposed Order Re: Protective Order, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. The Court is declining to sign. (SWT)
September 6, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending answer deadline re parties' 8 Stipulation; Great American Insurance Company answer due 9/29/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American States Insurance Company et al v. Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American States Insurance Company
Represented By: John Michael Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First National Insurance Company of America
Represented By: John Michael Silk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Leslie Ellen Barron
Represented By: Jonathan A Cipriani(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Ommid C Farashahi(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Timothy B Fitzgerald
Represented By: Michael T Skoglund(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?