The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company et al v. Shannon & Wilson, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company and St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Defendant: Shannon & Wilson, Inc., Hitachi Zosen U.S.A., Ltd. and Seattle Tunnel Partners
Case Number: 2:2017cv01208
Filed: August 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINTUE ORDER re parties' 26 Stipulated Motion of Dismissal. The stipulation is self-executing, and all of the claims in this action are DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of fees or costs to any party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER directing Clerk to close case for statistical purposes per telephonic notice from Plaintiffs' counsel that case has settled. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 23 Stipulated Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Reply to Complaint. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' complaint no later than December 28, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 21 Stipulated Motion to extend time to exchange initial disclosures. The parties shall exchange initial disclosures no later than December 22, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 17 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Hitachi Zosen U.S.A., Ltd. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation the Court DISMISSES Hitachi without prejudice and without fees or costs to either Party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 12 Stipulated Motion to extend time to file a responsive pleading. Shannon & Wilson must respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by November 30, 2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 8 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re 1 Complaint. Hitachi Zosen must respond to Plaintiffs' complaint by November 30, 2017. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company et al v. Shannon & Wilson, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Charter Oak Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St Paul Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Thomas Lether
Represented By: Eric J Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon & Wilson, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitachi Zosen U.S.A., Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Tunnel Partners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?