Robertson et al v. Insurance Auto Auctions, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Alan Robertson, Puget Sound Properties Commercial Real Estate Services, LLC, Christopher Corr and Kidder Mathews, LLC
Defendant: Insurance Auto Auctions, Inc and Peter Doder
Case Number: 2:2017cv01233
Filed: August 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER for Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel re parties' 29 Stipulation, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Attorney Gregory J Hollon for Insurance Auto Auctions, Inc added; Attorney Robert Leslie Christie terminated.)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 27 Stipulation and Joint Motion to Revise Case Schedule: Jury Trial is set for 4/22/2019 before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Deadline to complete private mediation or ADR is 5/24/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 6/29/2018, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 8/3/2018, Motions due by 10/31/2018, Discovery completed by 11/30/2018, Dispositive motions due by 1/10/2019, Motions in Limine due by 3/21/2019, Pretrial Order due by 4/5/2019, Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2019 at 02:00 PM before Judge Thomas S. Zilly. Trial briefs to be submitted by 4/5/2019, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 4/5/2019. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' 16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's estoppel claim; dismissing Defendant Peter Doder from this lawsuit without prejudice; dismissing without prejudice Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT) (Peter Doder terminated.)
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER striking without prejudice as moot defendants' 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 8 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Rule 12(b) Motion to Dismiss. The deadline for defendants to file a responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED to September 11, 2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson et al v. Insurance Auto Auctions, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan Robertson
Represented By: Michael Maurice Fleming
Represented By: Bryan C Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puget Sound Properties Commercial Real Estate Services, LLC
Represented By: Michael Maurice Fleming
Represented By: Bryan C Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Corr
Represented By: Michael Maurice Fleming
Represented By: Bryan C Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kidder Mathews, LLC
Represented By: Michael Maurice Fleming
Represented By: Bryan C Graff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Auto Auctions, Inc
Represented By: Robert Leslie Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter Doder
Represented By: Robert Leslie Christie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?