Whitsett v. Brand Energy Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: David Whitsett
Defendant: Brand Energy Services LLC, Brand Energy Solutions LLC, Brand Industrial Projects LLC, Brand Industrial Services, Inc., Brand Engineering, LLC, Brandengineeringsolutions Inc, Brand Energy & Infrastructure Holdings, Inc., Brand Energy & Infrastructure Services, Inc., Brand Energy, Inc., Industrial Specialty Services, LLC, Brand Scaffold Erectors, Inc. and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 2:2017cv01236
Filed: August 15, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL with prejudice. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER re: parties' 29 Stipulated MOTION Amending Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's 23 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment is re-noted for 8/17/2018; Defendant's response due 8/13/2017; Plaintiff's reply due 8/17/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER re: 25 Stipulated Motion Regarding Expert Depositions. The deadline for the completion of discovery is continued to September 7, 2018, for the limited purpose of allowing the depositions of Jesse Michaletz, CSP, Shane Leavitt, MD, John Burns, MD, to occur. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
July 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER revising case caption, dismissing certain defenses and dismissing unrelated defendants re parties' 21 Stipulated Motion. All claims against the remaining defendants, with the exception of BrandSafway LLC, are DISMISSED with prejudice and without the award of attorney's fees or costs. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(SWT) (Remaining defendants terminated.)
April 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing Select Case Schedule Dates re parties' 16 Stipulated Motion. The deadline for the disclosure of expert testimony is continued to June 1, 2018; The deadline for the completion of discovery is continued to July 6, 2018; and The deadline for filing dispositive motions is continued to July 20, 2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitsett v. Brand Energy Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Whitsett
Represented By: Brandon K. Batchelor
Represented By: James Vincent Hill
Represented By: Matthew Tyler Russell
Represented By: Dean Forrest Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Energy Services LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Macario
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Energy Solutions LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Macario
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Industrial Projects LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Macario
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Industrial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J Macario
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Engineering, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Macario
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandengineeringsolutions Inc
Represented By: Matthew J Macario
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Energy & Infrastructure Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J Macario
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Energy & Infrastructure Services, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J Macario
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J Macario
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Industrial Specialty Services, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Macario
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brand Scaffold Erectors, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew J Macario
Represented By: Suzanne Kelly Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?