Kucuk v. Central Washington University
Plaintiff: Selim Umit Kucuk
Defendant: Central Washington University
Case Number: 2:2017cv01262
Filed: August 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 36 DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(AE)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 43 Stipulated Motion to Stay Deadline to Complete Mediation signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. The Court will provide a new mediation deadline if this case is not finally resolved on summary judgment. (KMP)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MODEL PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 28 Stipulated Motion, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant CWU's 20 Motion to dismiss Dr. Kuchuk's amended complaint. The court denies CWU's motion to dismiss Dr. Kucuk's disparate impact claim and grants CWU's motion to dismiss Dr. Kucuk's retaliation and state law claims. The court DISMISSES Dr. Kucuk's retaliation claim WITH PREJUDICE and his state law claims WITHOUT PREJUDICE. The court denies Dr. Kucuk leave to amend any of the dismissed claim. Signed by Judge James L. Robart (PM)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss and allowing Plaintiff leave to amend his disparate impact and retaliation claims within 21 days of the entry of this order. The court dismisses Mr. Kucuk's disparate treatment claim with prejudice and without leave to amend. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kucuk v. Central Washington University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selim Umit Kucuk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Washington University
Represented By: Kaylynn What
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?