United States of America v. Yin et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: John Yin
Garnishee: T Rowe Price
Case Number: 2:2017cv01284
Filed: August 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER re: United States' 27 Motion to terminate garnishment proceedings. It is ordered that the garnishment is terminated and that T. Rowe Price is relieved from further responsibility pursuant to this garnishment. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: T. Rowe Price via first class mail
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER denying Defendant's 24 Motion to reinstate objections to the United Statess motion to issue a continuing garnishee order to Garnishee T. Rowe Price. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: defendant via first class mail
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 CONTINUING GARNISHEE ORDER by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: financial deputy, defendant Yin via first class mail
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Amended Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kirk C Davis terminated as counsel for Defendant John Yin. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: defendant Yin via first class mail
October 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice Kirk Davis's 18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Defendant John Yin. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER striking pro se 14 Response filed by John Yin signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM) cc: Mr. Yin via first class mail
September 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting govt's 15 Motion for Extension of Time to 10/4/17 to File Reply Brief signed by Judge James L. Robart.(RS) cc Yin
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Motion for Extension of Time signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Clerk to renote 7 Motion to Issue Continuing Garnishee Order for 9/29/17 and give this matter a civil action number. Case assigned to Hon. James Robart, case number 17-cv-1284-JLR. (cc: defendant)(ST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Yin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Yin
Represented By: Kirk C Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: T Rowe Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?