United States of America et al v. Renfrow
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Luann Renfrow
Garnishee: Greenway-Southlake Office Partners LP
Case Number: 2:2017cv01305
Filed: July 5, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 00:0000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER denying defendant's 13 Motion to Modify Writs of Continuing Garnishment; directing Clerk to CLOSE this case, signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT) (cc: Financial; Garnishees via USPS)
September 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to counsel's request, see Joint Notice of Related Cases (docket no. 11 in C17-1305), the following briefing schedule is hereby SET: Defendant's opening Brief due by 10/16/2017, Plaintiff's responsive Brief due by 10/23/2017, Defendant's optional reply Brief due by 10/27/2017, Noting Date 10/27/2017, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH) (cc: Garnishee via U.S. Mail)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. In light of defendant/judgment debtor's objections, the Clerk is directed to give this matter a civil action number and assign it in rotation. The requested hearing is to be held as soon as possible. The Writ of Garnishment shall remain in effect during the pendency of this action, but judgment shall not be entered absent further order of the Court. (cc: garnishee with copy of docket report with new civil case number)(ST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America et al v. Renfrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kyle A. Forsyth(Designation Assistant US Attorney)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luann Renfrow
Represented By: Barry L Flegenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Garnishee: Greenway-Southlake Office Partners LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?