Parenteau, Jr v. Cooper
Plaintiff: Richard L. Parenteau, Jr
Defendant: James Cooper
Case Number: 2:2017cv01318
Filed: August 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 8 Report and Recommendations, by Judge James L. Robart. The Court finds and orders 1) The Court adopts the Report and Recommendation. 2) Plaintiff's complaint and this action are DISMISSED with prejudice. (cc: Plaintiff)(SG)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS AND DIRECTING INSTITUTION TO CALCULATE, COLLECT, AND FORWARD PAYMENTS by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (cc: Plaintiff, WAWD Finance, King County Jail)(ST)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. Show Cause Response due by 9/29/2017. (cc: plaintiff) (ST)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parenteau, Jr v. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Parenteau, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?