International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division et al v. Alaska Air Group, Inc

Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division and Airline Professionals Assoc of The International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No 1224
Defendant: Alaska Air Group, Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01327
Filed: September 1, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2018 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 77 Motion to Continue to Seal signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
May 8, 2018 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting parties' 71 Stipulated Motion to Seal. Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. No. 74 ), along with all supporting declarations and exhibits (Dkt. No. 75 ), (collectively, "Plaintiffs' filing") shall be SEALED. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
April 13, 2018 70 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER setting briefing schedule for Defendants' 27 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' supplemental opposition due 5/4/2018; Defendants' supplemental reply due 5/18/2018. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
February 6, 2018 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING JOINT STATUS CONFERENCE re: production of non-privileged documents, electronically stored information and taking of deposition. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (see order for details) (PM)
December 18, 2017 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AWARDING FEES AND COSTS awarding to Plaintiffs attorney fees in the amount of $11,263.00, this amount to be paid by Defendants Alaska Air Group, Inc., and Horizon Air Industries, Inc. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
December 14, 2017 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ON COURT'S AWARD OF FEES AND COSTS re 58 Declaration. Counsel for Plaintiff are ordered to an amended declaration identifying only those fees and costs that were actually incurred in connection with their Motion for Protective Order and to Compel Initial Disclosures. Amended Declaration due in 5 days. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
December 12, 2017 59 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
December 6, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 33 Motion for Protective Order and to Compel Initial Disclosures. Defendants are ORDERED to produce the requested discovery identified in the Court's November 2 Order (Dkt. No. 32 ) within two (2) days of the date of this Order. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' request for attorneys' fees and costs associated with bringing this Motion, and ORDERS Plaintiffs to produce a calculation of those fees and costs they claim are recoverable within five (5) days of the date of this Order. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' 44 Motion to Stay Consideration of Defendants' 27 Motion to Dismiss and Relief from a Deadline. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division et al v. Alaska Air Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Airline Division
Represented By: Kathleen Phair Barnard
Represented By: Danielle Franco-Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Airline Professionals Assoc of The International Brotherhood of Teamsters, Local Union No 1224
Represented By: Kathleen Phair Barnard
Represented By: Danielle Franco-Malone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alaska Air Group, Inc
Represented By: Taylor S Ball
Represented By: Douglas W. Hall(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Mark A. Hutcheson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?