Clean Crawl, Inc. v. Crawl Space Cleaning Pros, Inc.
Plaintiff: Clean Crawl, Inc.
Defendant: Crawl Space Cleaning Pros, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01340
Filed: September 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting 109 Defendant's Motion for Protective Order and granting in part and denying in part 113 Plaintiff's cross-motion. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER DENYING THE REMAINING QUESTIONS ON DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. It is hereby ORDERED that CSCP's 39 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED only as to the second page of the Venting Calculator. The remainder of CSCP's 39 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. CCI's 74 motion for leave to supplement the record is GRANTED. CSCP's motions to seal, ( 77 , 93 ) and CCIs 98 motion to seal are DENIED. (ERA)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Summary Judgment, requesting supplemental briefing and re-noting 39 Motion for Summary Judgment for 2/22/2019. Signed by Judge Benjamin H. Settle. (MGC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clean Crawl, Inc. v. Crawl Space Cleaning Pros, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clean Crawl, Inc.
Represented By: David Allen Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crawl Space Cleaning Pros, Inc.
Represented By: Neil Armstrong Dial
Represented By: Hannah Jo Jackowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?