Edge et al v. City of Everett

Plaintiff: Jovanna Edge, Leah Humphrey, Liberty Ziska, Amelia Powell, Natalie Bjerke, Brittany Giazzi, Juanita Castaneda Guerrero and Matteson Hernandez
Defendant: City of Everett
Case Number: 2:2017cv01361
Filed: September 11, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 14, 2017 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 44 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (SWT)
November 13, 2017 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting City of Everett's 25 Motion for Leave to File Anonymous Declaration. The City shall file the Declaration of Jane Doe in Support of the City's Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction within five (5) days of this Order. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
October 25, 2017 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed 26 Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit J (Video) 33 of the Declaration of Michael Segal 32 . Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
September 18, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BRIEFING SCHEDULE; Motion for preliminary injunction due 9/21/17; response due 10/23/17; reply/noting date 11/3/17. Oral Argument on the motion for preliminary injunction set for 11/21/2017 at 10:00 AM. City's answer due by 10/30/17 by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edge et al v. City of Everett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Everett
Represented By: Sarah C Johnson
Represented By: Jamie L. Lisagor
Represented By: Ramsey Ramerman
Represented By: Matthew J Segal
Represented By: Sarah S Washburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jovanna Edge
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Represented By: Jessica V Newman
Represented By: Keith P Scully
Represented By: Jason Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Humphrey
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Represented By: Jessica V Newman
Represented By: Keith P Scully
Represented By: Jason Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Ziska
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Represented By: Jessica V Newman
Represented By: Keith P Scully
Represented By: Jason Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amelia Powell
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Represented By: Jessica V Newman
Represented By: Keith P Scully
Represented By: Jason Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natalie Bjerke
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Represented By: Jessica V Newman
Represented By: Keith P Scully
Represented By: Jason Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany Giazzi
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Represented By: Jessica V Newman
Represented By: Keith P Scully
Represented By: Jason Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juanita Castaneda Guerrero
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Represented By: Jessica V Newman
Represented By: Keith P Scully
Represented By: Jason Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matteson Hernandez
Represented By: Derek Alan Newman
Represented By: Jessica V Newman
Represented By: Keith P Scully
Represented By: Jason Sykes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?