Shotwell v. Zillow Group, Inc et al
Plaintiff: James Shotwell
Defendant: Zillow Group, Inc, Spencer M. Rascoff and Kathleen Philips
Case Number: 2:2017cv01387
Filed: September 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MINUTE ORDER re Parties' 123 Stipulated MOTION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Schedule. Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 2/25/2022, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 3/25/2022, Expert Discovery due by 4/22/2022. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
August 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MINUTE ORDER granting Parties' 119 120 Stipulated Motion and Proposed Order re Schedule. Discovery to be completed by 11/17/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 12/17/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 1/21/2022, Expert Discovery due by 2/18/2022. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SR)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MINUTE ORDER re the parties' 117 stipulation and proposed order regarding scheduling. The Court hereby ORDERS: 1. The parties shall file summary judgment motions by December 17, 2021. 2. The parties shall file oppositions to any su mmary judgment motions by February 25, 2022. 3. The parties shall file reply briefs in further support of their summary judgment motions by March 25, 2022. 4. The 10-day estimate trial, previously set for April 11, 2022, is continued to June 20, 2022 at 9:30 a.m.5. The proposed Pre-Trial Order is due by May 20, 2022. 6. Trial briefs and proposed voir dire/jury instructions are due by June 6, 2022. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PM)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 MINUTE ORDER re Parties' 115 Stipulation Regarding Scheduling: Fact Discovery to be completed by 9/17/2021, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 10/15/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 11/19/2021, Expert Discovery to be completed by 12/17/2021. Within 14 days of the issuance of this order, counsel for the parties must propose an updated case schedule governing the remaining deadlines contemplated by the Court's scheduling order, should any modifications be warranted. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (MW)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MINUTE ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on the parties' stipulation and proposed order regarding scheduling (Dkt. No. 112 ). Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the Court hereby ORDERS:1. The parties shall file summary jud gment motions by October 1, 2021;2. The parties shall file oppositions to any summary judgment motions by December 3, 2021;3. The parties shall file reply briefs in further support of their summary judgment motions by January 7, 2022;4 . The 10-day estimate trial, previously set for January 18, 2022, is continued to April 11, 2022 at 9:30 a.m.;5. The proposed Pre-Trial Order is due by March 14, 2022; and6. Trial briefs and proposed voir dire/jury instructions are due by March 28, 2022. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (LH)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 109 stipulation regarding scheduling. Fact Discovery deadline is 6/30/2021; Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26 (a)(2) due by 7/16/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 8/15/2021, Expert D iscovery completed by 9/14/2021. Within 14 days of the issuance of this order, counsel for the parties must propose an updated case schedule governing the remaining deadlines contemplated by the Court's scheduling order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PM)
January 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER granting Parties' 106 Stipulation For Approval of Notice and Summary Notice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (MW)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MINUTE ORDER: This matter comes before the Court on the parties' stipulation and proposed order regarding scheduling (Dkt. No. 104 ). Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the Court hereby ORDERS: 1. The parties shall file summary ju dgment motions by July 16, 2021; 2. The parties shall file oppositions to any summary judgment motions by September 17, 2021; 3. The parties shall file reply briefs in further support of their summary judgment motions by October 15, 2021; a nd 4. The 10-day estimate trial, previously set for October 18, 2021, is continued to January 18, 2022 at 9:30 a.m.; 5. The proposed Pre-Trial Order is due by December 17, 2021; and 6. Trial briefs and proposed voir dire/jury instructions are due by January 4, 2022. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (MW)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 MINUTE ORDER re Parties' 102 Stipulation: Fact discovery deadline is extended to 3/31/2021, affirmative expert report deadline is extended to 4/16/2021, rebuttal expert report deadline is extended to 5/16/2021, expert discovery deadline is extended to 6/15/2021. Within 14 days of the issuance of this order, counsel for the parties must propose an updated case schedule governing the remaining deadlines contemplated by the Court's scheduling order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (LH)
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 74 Motion for class certification. Jo Ann Offutt, Raymond Harris, and Johanna Choy are each appointed as representatives of the class. The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. are appointed as class counsel. The parties shall meet and confer on the form and manner of providing notice, and within sixty (60) days of the entry of this order, submit their proposal for notice to the class to the Court for approval. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PM)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER: This matter comes before the Court pursuant to the parties' stipulation and proposed order regarding scheduling (Dkt. No. 98 ). Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the Court hereby ORDERS: 1. The parties shall file summ ary judgment motions by 4/16/2021; 2. The parties shall file oppositions to any summary judgment motions by 6/16/2021; 3. The parties shall file reply briefs in further support of their summary judgment motions by 7/16/2021; and 4. The trial date, previously set for 1/11/2021, is continued to 10/18/2021. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (MW)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 96 Stipulation and Order regarding scheduling/ Fact Discovery completed by 12/20/2020, Expert Witness Disclosure/Reports under FRCP 26(a)(2) due by 1/6/2021, Rebuttal Expert Disclosure/Reports due by 2/2/2021, E xpert Discovery completed by 3/2/2021. Within 14 days of the issuance of this order, counsel for the parties must propose an updated case schedule governing the remaining deadlines contemplated by the Court's scheduling order. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 84 Stipulation and Order Regarding Class Certification Briefing Schedule. Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' class certification motion shall be filed no later than March 20, 2020. Plaintiffs 9; reply brief in support of their class certification motion shall be filed no later than May 4, 2020. Plaintiffs' class certification motion (Dkt. No. 74 is RENOTED for May 4, 2020. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 78 Stipulation and Order re Class Certification Briefing Schedule. Defendants' opposition to Plaintiffs' class certification motion shall be filed no later than February 21, 2020. Plaintiffs' re ply brief in support of their class certification motion shall be filed no later than April 6, 2020. Plaintiffs' class certification motion (Dkt. No. 74 ) is RENOTED for April 6, 2020. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 STIPULATED ESI Agreement re parties' 73 Stipulation signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 70 Stipulated Motion Regarding Scheduling: Parties shall exchange Initial Disclosure by 9/13/2019, Parties shall issue initial requests for production and interrogatories on or before 9/20/2019, Joinder of Part ies due by 10/11/2019, Plaintiffs shall file a motion for class certification on or before 10/11/2019, Defendants shall respond to any motion for class certification on or before 1/10/2019, plaintiffs shall file any reply in support of class certific ation on or before 2/24/2020, Parties shall complete all fact discovery by 6/27/2020, Parties shall exchange any affirmative expert reports on or before 7/13/2020, Parties shall exchange any rebuttal expert reports on or before 8/12/2020, Parties shall complete all expert discovery by 9/14/2020. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (SWT)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER denying Defendants' 50 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
November 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTE ORDER ADOPTING parties' 48 Stipulation and Order Regarding Briefing Schedule for Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss the second consolidated amended complaint by 12/17/18. Lead Plaintiffs shall file their opposition by 1/16/19. Defendants shall file their reply by 2/6/19. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting Defendants' 36 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and granting in part and denying in part Defendants' request for judicial notice (Dkt. Nos. 38 , 43 ). Plaintiffs' Exchange Act claims as pled in counts I and II are DISMISSED without prejudice and with leave to amend. The second amended complaint shall be filed within forty- five (45) days of this order. Plaintiffs' Securities Act claims as alleged in counts III and IV are DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER terminating the status conference scheduled for 2/20/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 32 Stipulation Regarding Deadline for Filing Amended Consolidated Complaint; Plaintiffs shall file an amended consolidated complaint on or before 2/19/2018; Defendants shall answer, move to dismiss or otherwise respond to the amended consolidated complaint on or before 4/5/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED ORDER to Consolidate. The Shotwell Action (Case No. 2:17-cv-01387-JCC) and Vargosko Action (Case No. 2:17-cv-01721-JCC) are consolidated for all purposes including, but not limited to, discovery, pretrial proceedings and trial proceedings. The docket in Case No. 2:17-cv-01387-JCC shall constitute the Master Docket for this action. Movants are appointed as Lead Plaintiffs of the Class, as Movants have the largest financial interest in this litigation. Movants' choice of counse l is approved, and accordingly, The Rosen Law Firm, P.A. is appointed as Lead Counsel and Hall & George PLLC is appointed as Local Counsel. Lead Counsel, after being appointed by the Court, shall manage the prosecution of this litigation. Within 14 d ays from the issuance of this order, counsel for the parties shall meet and confer regarding a deadline for filing an amended complaint and a briefing schedule for any motions to dismiss. The Clerk is DIRECTED to schedule a status conference for this matter on February 20, 2018 at 9:00 am. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER. The Court reschedules the status conference currently set for January 23, 2018 to January 5, 2018 at 9:30 am. The Clerk is DIRECTED to STRIKE the status conference scheduled for January 23, 2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER per 13 stipulation regarding service and response to amended complaint. Defendants accept service of Amended Complaint. Defendants shall not be required to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint filed on November 16, 2017 (Dkt. No. 10 ). Within 7 days following the entry of an order on the motion for appointment of lead plaintiff, counsel for the parties shall meet and confer regarding a deadline for filing an amended complaint and a briefing schedule for any motions to dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and then propose such schedule to the Court for approval. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shotwell v. Zillow Group, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Shotwell
Represented By: Clifford A Cantor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zillow Group, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer M. Rascoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Philips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?