Harris v. Chief Counsel Pacific District North et al
Plaintiff: Benny Ray Harris, Sr
Defendant: Chief Counsel Pacific District North and Chief Counsel
Case Number: 2:2017cv01405
Filed: September 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Defendants' 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing Plaintiff's complaint with prejudice, signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. The Court issued Plaintiff summons on September 26, 2017 (Dkt. No. 5 ), but Plaintiff has not yet filed proof of service. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file proof of service by February 23, 2018. Absent such proof, the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice for lack of prosecution. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail)
October 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 9 Second Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TH) (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Plaintiff via U.S. Mail; Copy of Application for Court-Appointed Counsel sent to Plaintiff)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, signed by Hon. James P. Donohue. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. Chief Counsel Pacific District North et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Ray Harris, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Counsel Pacific District North
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?