Humana Health Plan, Inc. v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Humana Health Plan Inc
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv01407
Filed: September 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: Thomas S. Zilly
Nature of Suit: Medicare Act
Cause of Action: 28:2345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been telephonically advised that this matter has been resolved, and it appearing that no issue remains for the Court's determination, IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice and without costs. In the event settlement is not perfected, either party may move to reopen and trial will be scheduled, provided such motion is filed within 60 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 14 Fourth Joint Motion for Extension of Certain Deadlines: Responsive pleading or motion due 4/13/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/27/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/11/2018, Joint Status Report due by 5/11/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 12 Third Motion for Extension of Certain Deadlines as follows: Responsive pleading or motion due 2/16/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 3/2/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 3/16/2018, Joint Status Report due by 3/16/2018, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly.(SWT)
November 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 9 Second Stipulated Motion treated as plaintiff's ex parte motion to extend certain deadlines; the following deadlines are EXTENDED: Deadline to file a responsive pleading or motion is 1/12/2018, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/26/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/9/2018, Joint Status Report due by 2/9/2018. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' 7 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ; deadline for defendant to file a responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED to November 13, 2017. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humana Health Plan, Inc. v. Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Humana Health Plan Inc
Represented By: Michael P. Abate(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Daniel J Shih
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?