Bell v. Mapfre Insurance et al

Plaintiff: Warren E. Bell, Sr.
Defendant: Mapfre Insurance and Ranjit Kaur
Case Number: 2:2017cv01420
Filed: September 20, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2017 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Clerk to close case re Plaintiff's 11 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Case, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
October 3, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why complaint should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; Plaintiff shall, within thirty (30) days of this order, file an amended complaint, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
September 29, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why complaint should not be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction; plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days of this Order, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
September 22, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bell v. Mapfre Insurance et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren E. Bell, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mapfre Insurance
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ranjit Kaur
Represented By: Rory W Leid, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?