The Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company v. Sanhu et al

Plaintiff: The Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company
Defendant: Sandeep Sanhu, Mary Ann Brown, Sherri Brown and Marilee Brown
Case Number: 2:2017cv01424
Filed: September 20, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 25, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal With Prejudice re parties' 13 Stipulation, by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (SWT)
December 20, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion to Continue Initial Scheduling Dates: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/15/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/23/2018, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 1/30/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
September 22, 2017 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 4 Motion for leave to retain annuity subject to legal hold signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(RS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company v. Sanhu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Variable Annuity Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert G Engel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandeep Sanhu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherri Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?