Pattison v. Omnitrition International, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deana Pattison
Defendant: Roger M. Daley, Jennifer Van Vynck, Omnitrition International, Inc., Barbara Daley, Does 1-100, Jennifer Van Vynck doing business as Jennifer Van Vynck Omnitrition Independent and Jennifer Van Vynck doing business as Jennifer Van Vynck Omnitrition Independent Distributor
Case Number: 2:2017cv01454
Filed: September 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James P Donohue
Referring Judge: James L Robart
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2018 Filing 64 JUDGMENT BY COURT: Defendants Omnitrition International, Inc., Roger M. Daley, Barbara Daley, and Jennifer Van Vynck's motion to dismiss is granted. (Order (Dkt. #63 ).) This action is dismissed with prejudice. (SWT)
June 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting defendants' #56 Motion to Dismiss; dismissing complaint with prejudice and without leave to amend, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER granting Attorney's #59 Motion for Withdrawal. Attorney Victor J Torres is terminated as counsel for the plaintiff in this case. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 11, 2018 Filing 61 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #59 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Torres, Victor)
June 11, 2018 Filing 60 DECLARATION of Victor J. Torres filed by Plaintiff Deana Pattison re #59 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Torres, Victor)
June 11, 2018 Filing 59 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney , filed by Plaintiff Deana Pattison. Noting Date 6/29/2018, (Torres, Victor)
May 18, 2018 Filing 58 REPLY, filed by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley, Omnitrition International, Inc., Jennifer Van Vynck, TO RESPONSE to #56 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint (Beneski, Kristin)
May 14, 2018 Filing 57 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Deana Pattison, to #56 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. (Torres, Victor)
April 25, 2018 Filing 56 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley, Omnitrition International, Inc., Jennifer Van Vynck. Noting Date 5/18/2018, (Beneski, Kristin)
April 11, 2018 Filing 55 Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND, filed by Deana Pattison. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Redline Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint)(Torres, Victor)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting Defendants' #10 #33 Motions to Dismiss. The court dismisses Ms. Pattison's complaint in its entirety and grants Ms. Pattison leave to amend within 20 days of entry of this order. The court denies Ms. Pattison's #15 Motion for Relief. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge James L. Robart. Deadline to complete discovery on class certification: 07/16/2018; Deadline for Plaintiffs to file motion for class certification: 08/16/2018. (AD)
February 2, 2018 Filing 52 REPLY, filed by Defendant Jennifer Van Vynck, TO RESPONSE to #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Bradley, Heidi)
January 29, 2018 Filing 51 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Deana Pattison, to #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Firkins, Tyler)
January 26, 2018 Filing 50 REPLY, filed by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley, Omnitrition International, Inc., TO RESPONSE to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Beneski, Kristin)
January 22, 2018 Filing 49 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Deana Pattison, to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Firkins, Tyler)
January 19, 2018 Filing 48 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 15. (Attachments: #1 ESI Agreement)(Beneski, Kristin)
January 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting the Daleys' #44 Motion for Reconsideration. The court's November 30, 2017, order (Dkt. #43 ) is VACATED; and The Clerk shall REOPEN this case, REINSTATE the pending motions (Dkt. # #10 , #15 , #33 ), RENOTE the motion to dismiss filed by the Daleys and Omnitrition (Dkt. #10 ) and the motion for relief (Dkt. #15 ) for January 26, 2018, and RENOTE the motion to dismiss filed by Ms. Van Vynck (Dkt. #33 ) for February 2, 2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
December 14, 2017 Filing 46 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Deana Pattison, to #44 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Remanding Case. (Firkins, Tyler)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER directing Plaintiff to respond to Defendant Roger Daley and Barbara Daley's #44 MOTION for Reconsideration by 12/14/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 5, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION for Reconsideration of Order Remanding Case, filed by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley. Noting Date 12/5/2017, (Bradley, Heidi)
November 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 VACATED PER #47 ORDER. ORDER REMANDING CASE. The court GRANTS the Daleys' motion for leave toamend their notice of removal (Dkt #24 ) and GRANTS Ms. Pattison's motion to remand (Dkt. #12 ). The court also DENIES as moot all remaining motions (Dkt. # #10 , #15 , #33 ). All further proceedings are REMANDED to the Superior Court for King County in the State of Washington. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded 14 days from the date of this Order, on 12/14/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart.(TH) Modified on 1/8/2018 to indicate order has been vacated (TH).
November 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Stipulated Motion to Extend Initial Disclosure and JSR Deadline signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 31, 2017 Filing 41 Stipulated Stipulated MOTION , filed by Plaintiff Deana Pattison. Noting Date 10/31/2017, (Torres, Victor)
October 27, 2017 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Jennifer Van Vynck filed by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley re #24 MOTION for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal (Bradley, Heidi)
October 27, 2017 Filing 39 DECLARATION of Cindy Jordan filed by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley re #24 MOTION for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Bradley, Heidi)
October 27, 2017 Filing 38 REPLY, filed by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley, TO RESPONSE to #24 MOTION for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal (Bradley, Heidi)
October 27, 2017 Filing 37 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Deana Pattison, TO RESPONSE to #12 MOTION to Remand (Firkins, Tyler)
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MINUTE ORDER re Pending Motions: Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley's #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM; Plaintiff Deana Pattison's #12 MOTION to Remand; Plaintiff Deana Pattison #15 MOTION for Relief from Deadline re' Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley's #24 MOTION for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal; Defendant Jennifer Van Vynck's #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 23, 2017 Filing 35 DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski filed by Defendant Jennifer Van Vynck re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bradley, Heidi)
October 23, 2017 Filing 34 PROPOSED ORDER (Unsigned) re #33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Bradley, Heidi)
October 23, 2017 Filing 33 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendant Jennifer Van Vynck. Noting Date 11/17/2017, (Bradley, Heidi)
October 23, 2017 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Deana Pattison filed by Plaintiff Deana Pattison re #24 MOTION for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal (Firkins, Tyler)
October 23, 2017 Filing 31 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Deana Pattison, to #24 MOTION for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal. (Firkins, Tyler)
October 23, 2017 Filing 30 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Deana Pattison, to #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Firkins, Tyler)
October 23, 2017 Filing 29 DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski filed by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley, Omnitrition International, Inc. re #12 MOTION to Remand (Bradley, Heidi)
October 23, 2017 Filing 28 RESPONSE, by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley, Omnitrition International, Inc., to #12 MOTION to Remand . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bradley, Heidi)
October 13, 2017 Filing 27 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff Deana Pattison, TO RESPONSE to #15 MOTION for Relief from Deadline re' Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Firkins, Tyler)
October 11, 2017 Filing 26 RESPONSE, by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley, Omnitrition International, Inc., to #15 MOTION for Relief from Deadline re' Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. (Bradley, Heidi)
October 11, 2017 Filing 25 PRAECIPE re #19 Amended Document Second Declaration of Kristin Beneski In Support of Removal by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley, Omnitrition International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Second Declaration of Kristin Beneski in Support of Removal, #2 Exhibit C)(Beneski, Kristin)
October 10, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to Amend Notice of Removal, filed by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/27/2017, (Bradley, Heidi)
October 10, 2017 Filing 23 DECLARATION of Jennifer Van Vynck re #19 Amended Document by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley (Bradley, Heidi)
October 10, 2017 Filing 22 DECLARATION of Cindy Jordan re #19 Amended Document by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley (Bradley, Heidi)
October 10, 2017 Filing 21 DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski re #19 Amended Document by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Bradley, Heidi)
October 10, 2017 Filing 20 NOTICE to Adverse Parties re #19 Amended Document ; filed by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley. (Bradley, Heidi)
October 10, 2017 Filing 19 AMENDMENT to #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint)(Bradley, Heidi)
October 10, 2017 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by William M. McCool; Case reassigned to Judge James L. Robart for all further proceedings. Hon. James P. Donohue no longer assigned to case. Cc to JLR. (TF)
October 6, 2017 Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER by Hon. James P. Donohue, United States Magistrate Judge; The Court accelerates the consent deadline. If declining consent, return the executed form by 10/13/2017. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
October 5, 2017 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Victor J. Torres filed by Plaintiff Deana Pattison re #15 MOTION for Relief from Deadline re' Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Torres, Victor)
October 5, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION for Relief from Deadline re' Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Deana Pattison. Noting Date 10/13/2017, (Torres, Victor)
October 5, 2017 Filing 14 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff Deana Pattison (Torres, Victor)
October 5, 2017 Filing 13 DECLARATION of Victor J. Torres filed by Plaintiff Deana Pattison re #12 MOTION to Remand (Torres, Victor)
October 5, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand , filed by Plaintiff Deana Pattison. Noting Date 10/27/2017, (Torres, Victor)
October 2, 2017 Filing 11 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Omnitrition International, Inc. (Bradley, Heidi)
October 2, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , filed by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley, Omnitrition International, Inc.. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/27/2017, (Bradley, Heidi)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 11/7/2017, FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 10/24/2017, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 10/31/2017, by Hon. James P. Donohue. (TF)
September 26, 2017 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND CONSENT FORM. If declining consent, return the executed form by 11/7/2017. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (TF)
September 26, 2017 Filing 7 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (ST)
September 26, 2017 Hon. James P. Donohue added. (ST)
September 26, 2017 NOTICE TO FILER: 1) When filing a Notice of Removal, the attorney or pro se party who filed the case on behalf of the plaintiff must be entered in order to receive notice of filings. In this case, Victor J Torres was not entered as counsel for the plaintiff. The docket has been updated. 2) The filer is responsible for entering party text exactly as it appears on the state court complaint. For example, a foreign corporation should have been entered as party text for Omnitrition International, Inc. The docket has been updated. 3) The filer must enter all parties appearing on the original state court complaint. In this case, Does 1-100 were not entered upon case opening. The docket has been updated. 4) Due to the number of errors made during the case opening process and the time spent correcting those errors, the filer is directed to review the attorney case opening instructions before filing another case in this court. The instructions can be found on the court's website at wawd.uscourts.gov. Thank you. (ST)
September 26, 2017 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Defendant(s) must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/3/2017. (ST)
September 26, 2017 ***NOTICE TO PARTIES*** re #8 Consent Form. This district has adopted an opt-out consent procedure. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily CONSENTED to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge UNLESS the consent form is returned by the due date indicating lack of consent. (TF)
September 25, 2017 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Cindy Jordan re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley (Bradley, Heidi)
September 25, 2017 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Barbara Daley re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley (Bradley, Heidi)
September 25, 2017 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Roger M. Daley re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley (Bradley, Heidi)
September 25, 2017 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Kristin Beneski re #1 Notice of Removal by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley (Bradley, Heidi)
September 25, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE to Adverse Parties re #1 Notice of Removal ; filed by Defendants Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley. (Bradley, Heidi)
September 25, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 17-2-19735-1; (Receipt # 0981-5030460), filed by Barbara Daley, Roger M. Daley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint Amended)(Bradley, Heidi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pattison v. Omnitrition International, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger M. Daley
Represented By: Heidi Brooks Bradley
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Heidi B Bradley
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Van Vynck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omnitrition International, Inc.
Represented By: Heidi Brooks Bradley
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Heidi B Bradley
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Daley
Represented By: Heidi Brooks Bradley
Represented By: Douglas W Greene
Represented By: Heidi B Bradley
Represented By: Kristin Beneski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Van Vynck doing business as Jennifer Van Vynck Omnitrition Independent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Van Vynck doing business as Jennifer Van Vynck Omnitrition Independent Distributor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deana Pattison
Represented By: Tyler K Firkins
Represented By: Victor J Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?