Lemmon v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Plaintiff: Leonard A. Lemmon
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01464
Filed: September 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: XX US, Outside District
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL re parties' 51 Stipulation. The Parties respectfully request a dismissal of the matter under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(l)(A)(ii), with each party to bear its own costs and fees. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER directing parties to submit a revised Joint Status Report and discovery plan no later than fourteen (14) days from the filing date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER for Extension re parties' 45 Stipulated Motion. Parties have until 11/1/2019 to notify the Court as to whether they have reached a resolution on remaining claims. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 STIPULATION AND ORDER of Dismissal of Class Claims with Prejudice re parties' 43 Stipulation. The parties will provide a Status Report by 10/18/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Proceedings re parties' 40 Status Report and Stipulation. Parties shall notify the Court by no later than 10/18/2019 as to whether they have reached a resolution of remaining individual claims, or alternatively, propose a scheduling order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Proceedings re parties' 36 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Stay Proceedings re parties' 32 Stipulation. All deadlines in this case are stayed for sixty days. The parties will file a joint status report within two weeks of the execution of the settlement agreement, but in any event by no later than 2/19/2019. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION AND ORDER staying deadlines in this case by 60 days. Parties will file a Joint Status Report by 12/21/2018 regarding the status of settlement. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadlines Related to Discovery and Class Certification signed by Judge James L. Robart. Parties to file a Joint Status Report apprising the Court of the outcome of the August mediation by 8/10/2018; Deadline t o complete fact discovery related to class certification is 10/26/2018; Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification due 11/30/2018; Defendant's Opposition to Class Certification due 1/4/2018; Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Class Certification due 1/18/2018. (TH)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES RELATED TO DISCOVERY AND CLASS CERTIFICATION signed by Judge James L. Robart. Deadline to complete fact discovery related to class certification is 7/27/2018; Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification due 8/24/2018; Defendant's Opposition to Class Certification due 9/21/2018; Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Class Certification due 10/5/2018. (PM)
January 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES RELATED TO CLASS CERTIFICATION signed by Judge James L. Robart. Deadline to complete fact discovery related to class certification is 5/4/2018; Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification due 6/8/2018; Defendant's Opposition to Class Certification due 7/13/2018; Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Class Certification due 8/10/2018. (PM)
December 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge James L. Robart. Deadline to complete discovery on class certification: February 26, 2018; Deadline for Plaintiffs to file motion for class certification: March 27, 2018. (AD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemmon v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard A. Lemmon
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Adams
Represented By: Erika L. Nusser
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?