Koffa v. Andrew et al
Plaintiff: Bennie Sayee Koffa
Defendant: Andrew, Peter's Place Homeless Shelter, Tim Burgess, Jay Inslee and US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Case Number: 2:2017cv01466
Filed: September 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss and denying as moot Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Deposition. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TH) (cc: Pro Se Litigants via U.S. Mail)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 4 Motion to Appoint Counsel authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour.(TH) (cc: Pro Se Parties via U.S. Mail)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER RE-NOTING Plaintiff's 7 MOTION to Dismiss, Plaintiff's 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel, and Plaintiff's 8 MOTION for Deposition of Respondents ; Noting Date 12/22/2017. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (SWT) (cc: Pro Se parties via USPS)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER REFERRING TO PRO BONO PANEL re: Plaintiff's 4 Motion for Court-Appointed Counsel. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM) cc: S. Haas Modified on 10/23/2017: copy sent to plaintiff via first class mail (PM).
October 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting plaintiff's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida. (SWT) (cc: Plaintiff via USPS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koffa v. Andrew et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bennie Sayee Koffa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peter's Place Homeless Shelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Burgess
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Inslee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Citizenship and Immigration Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?