Aikens v. Panatte, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Delia Aikens
Defendant: Panatte, LLC, Land Home Financial Services, Inc. and Mortgage Default Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv01519
Filed: October 10, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Brian A Tsuchida
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 7, 2018 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiff's 39 Motion for preliminary approval of the Class Action Settlement Agreement Between Delia Aikens and Mortgage Default Services, LLC. Final Fairness Hearing set for 1/10/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Robert S. Lasnik. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (PM)
July 10, 2018 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Extending Class Certification-Related Deadlines re parties' 44 Joint Motion; deadline for Plaintiff to file any motion for class certification extended to 7/20/2018, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
May 10, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 42 Stipulation, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
February 6, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Deadline for Defendant Mortgage Default Services LLC to Answer Complaint re parties' 32 Stipulation; Defendant MDS to answer amended complaint by 2/9/2018, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
December 6, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for Defendant Panatte, LLC to respond to Complaint re parties' 16 Stipulation; time for defendant Panatte, LLC to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED to 12/8/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)
November 15, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for Defendant Land Home Financial Services, Inc. to Respond to Complaint re parties' 9 Stipulation; Land Home Financial Services, Inc. answer due 12/8/2017, signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aikens v. Panatte, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delia Aikens
Represented By: Mathew J. Cunanan
Represented By: Drew Davis
Represented By: Jesse S Johnson(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Milena Marie Vill
Represented By: Christopher Wieting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panatte, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Land Home Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: Andrea Delgadillo Ostrovsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Default Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?