Sciabacucchi et al v. Barton et al
Plaintiff: Zillow Group, Inc and Matthew Sciabacucchi
Defendant: Richard N. Barton, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Phillips, Jay C. Hoag, Spencer M. Rascoff, Erik C Blachford, Gordon S Stephenson, Lloyd D. Frink, Gregory L Waldorf, Lloyd D Frink, Richard N Barton, Jay C Hoag, Kathleen Philips, Gregory B Maffei and Spencer M Rascoff
Nominal Defendant: Zillow Group Inc
Consolidated Plaintiff: Melvyn Klein
Consolidated Defendant: April Underwood
Case Number: 2:2017cv01568
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Commerce ICC Rates, Etc.
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 73 REQUEST by Consol Plaintiff Melvyn Klein, Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi for Consolidating Related Action (Turner, Duncan)
March 9, 2021 Filing 72 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:21-cv-00285, by Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi. (Turner, Duncan)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re Parties' #68 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER (Agreement Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (LH)
November 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER re Parties' #67 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Protective Order). Signed by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (LH)
October 2, 2020 Filing 69 PRAECIPE to attach document (Redline Stipulated Protective Order) re #67 Stipulation by Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline Comparison of Stiulated Protective Order and the Court's Model Protective Order)(Knowles, Sean)
September 24, 2020 Filing 68 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER (Agreement Regarding Discovery of Electronically Stored Information) by parties (Knowles, Sean)
September 24, 2020 Filing 67 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER (Stipulated Protective Order) by parties (Knowles, Sean)
September 1, 2020 Filing 66 CIVIL TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the parties' joint status report, the Court issues the following scheduling order. Jury instructions must be numbered sequentially. Counsel should submit two copies of proposed jury instructions, one with citations and one without, and should send electronic copies of the instructions to the chambers orders inbox at coughenourorders@wawd.uscourts.gov. Counsel are advised that the Court relies primarily upon the Ninth Circuit Manual for Model Jury Instructions to prepare final instructions for submission to the jury.Counsel are advised that this case is one of several cases set for the week described in this order. Counsel must be prepared to commence trial as scheduled but also be aware that the trial may have to be continued. Counsel are directed to contact the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at gabriel.traber@wawd.uscourts.gov two to four weeks in advance of the trial date to inquire about the Court's calendar.Case management dates are established as follows: 5 Day Estimate Jury Trial is set for 11/1/2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. Pretrial Order due by 10/22/2021, Pleading amendment/3rd pty action due by 3/1/2021, 39.1 mediation to be completed by 7/19/2021, Trial briefs to be submitted by 10/28/2021, Proposed voir dire/jury instructions due by 10/28/2021, Discovery completed by 7/6/2021, Dispositive motions due by 8/3/2021. Counsel must attend Courtroom Technology Training at least one month in advance of the trial to become familiar with the new A/V equipment now available in the courtroom. Training is held at 3:00 PM on the 1st and 3rd Wednesday of each month. (GT)
June 29, 2020 Filing 65 JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5. (Knowles, Sean)
June 5, 2020 Filing 64 MINUTE ORDER re parties' #58 stipulation and proposed order regarding substitution of counsel. The law firm of Mayer Brown LLP and attorneys Joseph De Simone, Kelly B Kramer, Matthew D Ingber, Michael E Rayfield, Stephanie C Robinson, and the law firm of Perkins Coie LLP, and Sean C. Knowles and Ronald L. Berenstain of Perkins Coie LLP,are withdrawn as counsel of record in this action for Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc. The law firm of Savitt Bruce & Willey LLP, and James P. Savitt and Brandi B. Balanda of Savitt Bruce & Willey LLP, are substituted as counsel of record for Zillow Group in the Action. The law firm of Mayer Brown LLP, and attorneys Joseph De Simone, Kelly B. Kramer, Matthew D. Ingber, Michael E. Rayfield, and Stephanie C. Robinson of Mayer Brown LLP, and the law firm of Perkins Coie LLP, and Sean C. Knowles and Ronald L. Berenstain of Perkins Coie LLP, remain as counsel of record for Defendants Richard Barton, Erik Blachford, Lloyd Frink, Jay Hoag, Gregory Maffei, Spencer Rascoff, Gordon Stephenson, Gregory Waldorf, and Kathleen Philips, and the law firm of Perkins Coie LLP, and Sean C. Knowles and Ronald L. Berenstain of Perkins Coie LLP, remain as counsel of record for Non-Party April Underwood. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (PM)
May 27, 2020 Filing 63 LETTER from the Court. (GT)
May 27, 2020 Filing 62 MINUTE ENTRY SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES All counsel and any pro se parties are directed to meet and confer and to provide the Court with a combined Joint Status Report (the Report) by the deadline set below. This meet-and-confer must be a face-to-face meeting or a telephonic conference. If the parties are unable to agree on any part of the Report, they may answer in separate paragraphs; no separate reports are to be filed. The Report must contain the following information: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; and 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation.The deadlines below may be extended only by court order. Any request for extension of these deadlines should be made by email to Courtroom Deputy Clerk Gabriel Traber at gabriel_traber@wawd.uscourts.gov. The parties who have appeared in this matter must meet and confer before contacting the Court to request an extension. If this case involves claims that are exempt from the requirements of FRCP 26(a) and 26(f), please notify the Courtroom Deputy Clerk. Please note: Initial Disclosures are not to be filed. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 6/15/2020, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 6/22/2020, Joint Status Report due by 6/29/2020. (GT)
May 27, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Stricken Status Conference on 6/23/2020. (GT)
May 18, 2020 Filing 60 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Individual Defendants' Answer to the Verified Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint with JURY DEMAND by Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf.(Ingber, Matthew)
May 18, 2020 Filing 59 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Shareholder Derivative Attorney James P Savitt added to party Zillow Group Inc(pty:nd) by Zillow Group Inc.(Savitt, James)
May 18, 2020 Filing 58 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by parties (Savitt, James)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER re #56 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Michael E Rayfield for Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, and Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
May 6, 2020 Filing 56 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michael Rayfield FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6318623 (Knowles, Sean)
April 27, 2020 Filing 55 MINUTE ORDER re parties' #54 Stipulation. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs' amended verified shareholder derivative complaint no later than May 18, 2020. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 22, 2020 Filing 54 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline by parties (Ingber, Matthew)
March 12, 2020 Filing 53 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #52 Stipulated request for an extension of time for Defendants to respond to the complaint. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs' amended verified shareholder derivative complaint no later than April 27, 2020. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
March 11, 2020 Filing 52 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Defendants' Responsive Pleading Deadline by parties (Knowles, Sean)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying Defendants' #43 Motion to Dismiss signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 27, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE The Court hereby orders a Status Conference be set for 6/23/2020 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour.(PP)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER re #48 Application. The Court ADMITS Attorney Robert B Weiser for Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
November 15, 2019 Filing 48 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Robert B. Weiser FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi. Receipt No. 0981-6012153 (Turner, Duncan)
November 13, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Brett D. Stecker for Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi. (Turner, Duncan)
November 6, 2019 Filing 46 REPLY, filed by Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc, TO RESPONSE to #43 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint (Ingber, Matthew)
October 7, 2019 Filing 45 RESPONSE, by Consol Plaintiff Melvyn Klein, Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi, to #43 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint. Oral Argument Requested. (Turner, Duncan)
August 22, 2019 Filing 44 DECLARATION of Matthew D. Ingber filed by Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc re #43 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Ingber, Matthew)
August 22, 2019 Filing 43 MOTION to Dismiss the Verified Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint, filed by Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/8/2019, (Ingber, Matthew)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #35 Motion to Seal. The Clerk shall maintain a copy of the verified consolidated shareholder complaint (Dkt. No. #37 ) under seal until further order of the Court. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
July 22, 2019 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Bradley D. Owens filed by Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Consol Defendant April Underwood, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc re #35 MOTION to Seal Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint (Knowles, Sean)
July 22, 2019 Filing 40 RESPONSE, by Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Consol Defendant April Underwood, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc, to #35 MOTION to Seal Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint. (Knowles, Sean)
July 11, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE that the following is RE-NOTED: #35 MOTION to Seal Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint. Filed by Consol Plaintiff Melvyn Klein, Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi. Noting Date 7/26/2019, (Turner, Duncan)
July 9, 2019 Filing 38 PRAECIPE to attach document to Verified Consolidated Shareholder Derivative Complaint re #37 Sealed Document, by Consol Plaintiff Melvyn Klein, Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Turner, Duncan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 37 SEALED DOCUMENT Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint by Consol Plaintiff Melvyn Klein, Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi re #35 MOTION to Seal Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint, #36 Declaration (Turner, Duncan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 36 DECLARATION of James M. Ficaro filed by Consol Plaintiff Melvyn Klein, Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi re #35 MOTION to Seal Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Turner, Duncan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Seal Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint, filed by Consol Plaintiff Melvyn Klein, Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/19/2019, (Turner, Duncan)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re #30 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew D Ingber for defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf and nominal defendant Zillow Group Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re #29 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Joseph De Simone for Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, and nominal defendant Zillow Group Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER re #28 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Kelly B Kramer for defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson and Gregory L Waldorf, and nominal defendant Zillow Group Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER re #27 Application,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephanie C Robinson for Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson and Gregory L Waldorf, and nominal defendant Zillow Group Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
June 24, 2019 Filing 30 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew D. Ingber FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5820085 (Knowles, Sean)
June 24, 2019 Filing 29 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Joseph De Simone FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5820079 (Knowles, Sean)
June 24, 2019 Filing 28 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Kelly B. Kramer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5820072 (Knowles, Sean)
June 24, 2019 Filing 27 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephanie C. Robinson FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc. Receipt No. 0981-5820049 (Knowles, Sean)
June 24, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL: Attorney Alexander Mircheff and Meryl L Young for Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc. (Knowles, Sean)
June 17, 2019 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER re parties' #24 Stipulation and Order. Plaintiff shall have twenty-one (21) days from the entry of the order approving this stipulation to file a consolidated complaint. Defendants shall have forty-five (45) days from the filing of the consolidated complaint to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. Plaintiffs shall have forty-five (45) days to oppose any such motion to dismiss the Complaint. Defendants shall have thirty (30) days to file any reply in further support of a motion to dismiss. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
June 12, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER (Scheduling) by parties (Knowles, Sean)
May 20, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE (Joint) Pursuant to Consolidation and Stay Order ; filed by Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc. (Knowles, Sean)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER to Consolidate re parties' #21 Stipulation for Consolidation, Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel and Stay of the Actions. The Court finds that all proceedings should be stayed in this consolidated action pending the resolution of Defendants' motion to dismiss in the Securities Action. The files of the Consolidated Action will be maintained in one file under Master File No. C17-1568-JCC. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
January 31, 2018 Filing 21 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER for Consolidation, Appointment of Lead Plaintiffs and Co-Lead Counsel and Stay of the Actions by parties (Berenstain, Ronald)
January 8, 2018 Filing 20 MINUTE ENTRY re: STATUS CONFERENCE. The attorney who will be responsible for trying the case, or that attorney's representative, should attend the conference and be prepared to discuss the following matters at the conference: 1. An estimate of the number of days needed for trial; 2. The date by which the case will be ready for trial; 3. Whether the parties intend to mediate per LCR 39.1 and, if so, when the parties expect to complete mediation; If counsel's office is outside of the Greater Metropolitan Seattle area, local counsel should attend on behalf of non-local counsel. If local counsel is unavailable, non-local counsel may make arrangements to participate telephonically in the conference by contacting the Courtroom Deputy Clerk at Paul_Pierson@wawd.uscourts.gov at least TEN (10) DAYS in advance of the proceeding. Counsel do NOT need to file a Joint Status Report or Rule 26(f) Report in advance of the Status Conference. Counsel should plan on arriving 10-15 minutes early to check in with the Courtroom Deputy Clerk as the Court's calendar begins promptly at 9:00 a.m. COUNSEL OR THE PRO SE PARTY WHO FILED THIS MATTER SHALL IMMEDIATELY NOTIFY ALL PARTIES OF THE DATE AND TIME OF THE SCHEDULED STATUS CONFERENCE. A Status Conference is set for 2/20/2018 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 16206 before U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
January 5, 2018 Filing 17 PLEASE DISREGARD. DOCKETED IN ERROR ORDER to Consolidate. The Shotwell Action (Case No. 2:17-cv-01387-JCC) and Vargosko Action (Case No. 2:17-cv-01568-JCC) are consolidated for all purposes including, but not limited to, discovery, pretrial proceedings and trial proceedings. The docket in Case No. 2:17-cv-01387-JCC shall constitute the Master Docket for this action. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) Modified on 1/5/2018 to strike filing as it referenced incorrect case to consolidate (TH).
January 5, 2018 NOTICE of Docket Text Modification re #17 Consolidation Order - for Member cases only : Document was stricken as order referenced incorrect case number to consolidate. (TH)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney James M Ficaro for Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Brett D. Stecker for Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 27, 2017 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY James M. Ficaro FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5142588 (Turner, Duncan)
December 27, 2017 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Brett D. Stecker FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Matthew Sciabacucchi (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5142536 (Turner, Duncan)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by U.S. District Judge John C. Coughenour. (PP)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER authorized by Judge Richard A Jones. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour as related to C17-1387JCC for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall bear case number C17-1568JCC. (PM) Cc to JCC.
December 18, 2017 Filing 10 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 17-cv-1387; 17-cv-1721, by Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group, Inc. (Berenstain, Ronald)
December 18, 2017 The Court acknowledges the requirements of FRCP 16(b), but finds good cause to defer entry of an initial case scheduling order given the parties' stipulation that the deadline for all Defendants, including Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc., to file a motion to dismiss or otherwise respond to the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint has been extended to 2/16/2018. (VE)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Alexander Mircheff for Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group, Inc by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice,. The Court ADMITS Attorney Meryl L Young Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group, Inc by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)
December 14, 2017 Reset Deadline: Pursuant to the parties' #7 STIPULATION Regarding Defendants' Common Responsive Pleading Deadline, the deadline for all Defendants, including Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc., to file a motion to dismiss or otherwise respond to the Verified Shareholder Derivative Complaint shall be extended to 2/16/2018. Absent further agreement or order of the Court, deadlines for any additional briefing shall be set in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. The parties' stipulation is without prejudice to any rights of the parties, whether procedural or substantive. (VE)
December 13, 2017 Attorney Sean C Knowles for Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Zillow Group, Inc added; per #3 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
December 13, 2017 Filing 7 STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER Regarding Defendants' Common Responsive Pleading Deadline by parties (Berenstain, Ronald)
December 13, 2017 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Alexander K. Mircheff FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group, Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5127550 (Berenstain, Ronald)
December 13, 2017 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Meryl L. Young FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group, Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5127548 (Berenstain, Ronald)
December 13, 2017 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Zillow Group, Inc (Berenstain, Ronald)
December 13, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ronald L Berenstain on behalf of Defendants Richard N. Barton, Erik C Blachford, Lloyd D. Frink, Jay C. Hoag, Gregory B. Maffei, Kathleen Philips, Spencer M. Rascoff, Gordon S Stephenson, Gregory L Waldorf, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group, Inc. (Berenstain, Ronald)
October 30, 2017 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE)
October 24, 2017 Judge Richard A Jones added. (ST)
October 24, 2017 NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Nominal Defendant Zillow Group Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 10/31/2017. (ST)
October 23, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT VERIFIED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE COMPLAINT against defendant(s) All Plaintiffs with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5063173), filed by Zillow Group, Inc, Matthew Sciabacucchi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Turner, Duncan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sciabacucchi et al v. Barton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard N. Barton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory B. Maffei
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay C. Hoag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer M. Rascoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik C Blachford
Represented By: Stephanie C Robinson
Represented By: Matthew D Ingber
Represented By: Kelly B Kramer
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Michael E Rayfield
Represented By: Meryl L Young
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph De Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon S Stephenson
Represented By: Stephanie C Robinson
Represented By: Matthew D Ingber
Represented By: Kelly B Kramer
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Michael E Rayfield
Represented By: Meryl L Young
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph De Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd D. Frink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory L Waldorf
Represented By: Stephanie C Robinson
Represented By: Matthew D Ingber
Represented By: Kelly B Kramer
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Michael E Rayfield
Represented By: Meryl L Young
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph De Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lloyd D Frink
Represented By: Stephanie C Robinson
Represented By: Matthew D Ingber
Represented By: Kelly B Kramer
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Michael E Rayfield
Represented By: Meryl L Young
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph De Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard N Barton
Represented By: Stephanie C Robinson
Represented By: Matthew D Ingber
Represented By: Kelly B Kramer
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Michael E Rayfield
Represented By: Meryl L Young
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph De Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay C Hoag
Represented By: Stephanie C Robinson
Represented By: Matthew D Ingber
Represented By: Kelly B Kramer
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Michael E Rayfield
Represented By: Meryl L Young
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph De Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Philips
Represented By: Stephanie C Robinson
Represented By: Matthew D Ingber
Represented By: Kelly B Kramer
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Michael E Rayfield
Represented By: Meryl L Young
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph De Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory B Maffei
Represented By: Stephanie C Robinson
Represented By: Matthew D Ingber
Represented By: Kelly B Kramer
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Michael E Rayfield
Represented By: Meryl L Young
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph De Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer M Rascoff
Represented By: Stephanie C Robinson
Represented By: Matthew D Ingber
Represented By: Kelly B Kramer
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Michael E Rayfield
Represented By: Meryl L Young
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Joseph De Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zillow Group, Inc
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Sciabacucchi
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Represented By: James M Ficaro
Represented By: Robert B Weiser
Represented By: Brett D. Stecker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Nominal defendant: Zillow Group Inc
Represented By: Stephanie C Robinson
Represented By: Matthew D Ingber
Represented By: Brandi Buehn Balanda
Represented By: Kelly B Kramer
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Michael E Rayfield
Represented By: James P Savitt
Represented By: Meryl L Young
Represented By: Alexander Mircheff
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Represented By: Joseph De Simone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Melvyn Klein
Represented By: Thomas J McKenna
Represented By: Blythe H Chandler
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Represented By: Duncan Calvert Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: April Underwood
Represented By: Ronald L Berenstain
Represented By: Sean C Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?