Castillo v. United Rentals (North America), Inc.

Plaintiff: Ricardo Castillo
Defendant: United Rentals (North America), Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01573
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Kitsap
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2018 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting parties' 60 Stipulated Motion re Case Management Order, signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
August 6, 2018 55 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER granting 54 Stipulation for Plaintiff to file Third Amended Complaint. Defendant has 30 days to answer or otherwise respond. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 16, 2018 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 44 Motion for Leave to file a second amended complaint. Amended complaint due within seven (7) days of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 29, 2018 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 45 Stipulated Motion to Vacate Case Schedule. The Court accordingly vacates the case schedule previously set forth in the Court's April 16, 2018 Order. The Parties are hereby ORDERED to jointly confer regarding the propriety and terms of a revised case management schedule within 14 days of the Court's entry of an order upon Plaintiff's pending motion to amend his complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
June 1, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 42 Stipulated Motion Striking In-Court Hearing. The Court STRIKES the June 4, 2018 hearing from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 23, 2018 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER SETTING HEARING. Parties are ordered to file statements of no more than three (3) pages explaining nature of discovery disputes, no later than 5/31/2018 at 5:00 pm. In-court Hearing set for 6/4/2018 at 02:00 PM regarding the disputes. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
April 16, 2018 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re Case Schedule re parties' 36 Stipulated MOTION. Deadline for plaintiff to file his motion for conditional FLSA certification: July 16, 2018. Deadline to complete discovery regarding class certification and collec tive decertification: 90 days after the end of the opt-in period for any conditionally-certified FLSA collective. Deadline for plaintiff to file his class certification motion: 30 days after the discovery cutoff. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
March 27, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER vacating the 1/29/2018 27 Case Management Order. Parties to propose new case management dates regarding discovery, confidential certification, class certification, and decertification by 4/13/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 19, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's 16 Motion to Dismiss Mr. Castillo's complaint. The court grants Mr. Castillo leave to amend within 15 days of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 15, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re parties' 28 Stipulation, by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
January 29, 2018 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Plaintiff's Richard Castillo's Motion for Conditional Certification to be filed by 4/23/2018; Class Certification Motion due 8/17/2018; United Rentals' opposition to motion for class, as well as United Rentals' mo tion for decertification due 9/17/2018; Plaintiff's reply to motion for class certification and opposition to motion for decertification due 10/8/2018; United Rentals' reply in support of motion to decertify due 10/22/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 18, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re-noting Defendant's 16 MOTION to Dismiss for 1/26/2018. Reply due 1/23/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 8, 2017 15 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER REGARDING CLASS/COLLECTIVE CERTIFICATION MOTION by Judge James L. Robart. Deadline to complete discovery on class/collective certification: March 23, 2018; Deadline for Plaintiffs to file motion for class/collective certification: April 23, 2018. (AD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo v. United Rentals (North America), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Castillo
Represented By: Carolyn Hunt Cottrell(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: David C. Leimbach(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Beth E Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Rentals (North America), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?