City of Seattle v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Seattle
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Purdue Pharma, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Seattle Pain Center Medical Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Frank D. Li, Watson Laboratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Allergan PLC, Cephalon, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Frank D Li, Watson Laboratories Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Does 1 through 100, inclusive, The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, Actavis Pharma Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, Watson Pharma Inc, Actavis PLC and Seattle Pain Center Medical Corporation doing business as Seattle Pain Center
Case Number: 2:2017cv01577
Filed: October 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Thomas S Zilly
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2018 Filing 36 TRANSFERRED CASE opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:18-op-45089 on 1/23/2018. (SWT)
December 26, 2017 Case sent to District of Northern District of Ohio by electronic case transfer. (SWT)
December 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Lifting Stay of Conditional Transfer Order (MDL 2804 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 1)); in re National Prescription Opiate Litigation; Northern District of Ohio; assigned to Judge Dan A. Polster. (SWT)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendants' #22 Motion to Stay and for Relief From Deadlines. The deadline for any responsive pleading or motion is EXTENDED from January 29, 2018, to March 16, 2018. Plaintiff's motion to remand, docket no. #11 , is RENOTED to February 2, 2018, and will be decided, if appropriate, after the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation ("MDL") issues a ruling on plaintiff's opposition to the conditional transfer order in MDL No. 2804, which is currently set for hearing without oral argument on January 25, 2018. The request for a stay is DENIED. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
December 6, 2017 Filing 33 NOTICE of Developments in In Re: National Prescription Opiate Litigation ; filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berman, Steve)
December 5, 2017 Attorney James Harlan Wendell for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc added; per #31 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
December 5, 2017 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Cupric Holding Co., Inc. for Cephalon Inc; Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd for Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc; Corporate Parent Orvet UK, Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Holdings Cooperative U.A., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceuticals Europe B.V., Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent IVAX LLC for Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc; Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. for Watson Laboratories Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc (Mangan, Brendan)
December 5, 2017 Filing 31 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brendan Thomas Mangan on behalf of Defendants Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Cephalon Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc. (Mangan, Brendan)
November 29, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE of Supplemental Authority re #11 MOTION to Remand and for Expedited Consideration by Plaintiff City of Seattle (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berman, Steve)
November 24, 2017 Filing 29 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Remand and for Expedited Consideration (Berman, Steve)
November 24, 2017 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Jennifer Fountain Connolly filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle re #11 MOTION to Remand and for Expedited Consideration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Berman, Steve)
November 24, 2017 Filing 27 REPLY, filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Remand and for Expedited Consideration (Berman, Steve)
November 20, 2017 Filing 26 RESPONSE, by Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., to #11 MOTION to Remand and for Expedited Consideration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Hineline, Curt)
November 17, 2017 Filing 25 REPLY, filed by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc, TO RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Stay and for Relief From Deadlines (Adams, Thomas)
November 15, 2017 Filing 24 DECLARATION of Ben M. Harrington filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle re #22 MOTION to Stay and for Relief From Deadlines (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Berman, Steve)
November 15, 2017 Filing 23 RESPONSE, by Plaintiff City of Seattle, to #22 MOTION to Stay and for Relief From Deadlines. (Berman, Steve)
November 9, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION to Stay and for Relief From Deadlines, filed by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/17/2017, (Adams, Thomas)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re #16 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Timothy W Knapp for Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC,and for Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER re #15 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Martin L Roth for Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, and Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re #14 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jennifer G Levy for Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, and Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re #13 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Donna M Welch for Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC and Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(CDA)
November 9, 2017 Filing 17 DEMAND for JURY TRIAL by Plaintiff City of Seattle (Berman, Steve)
November 9, 2017 Filing 16 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Timothy William Knapp FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5085811 (Fandel, Kent)
November 9, 2017 Filing 15 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Martin Lewis Roth FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5085802 (Fandel, Kent)
November 9, 2017 Filing 14 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jennifer Gardner Levy FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5085795 (Fandel, Kent)
November 9, 2017 Filing 13 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Donna Marie Welch FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5085776 (Fandel, Kent)
November 2, 2017 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Steve W. Berman filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle re #11 MOTION to Remand and for Expedited Consideration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J)(Berman, Steve)
November 2, 2017 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand and for Expedited Consideration, filed by Plaintiff City of Seattle. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 11/24/2017, (Berman, Steve)
November 1, 2017 Attorney Bruce A Rubin for Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc added; per #9 Notice of Appearance. (SWT)
November 1, 2017 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Allergan PLC, Other Affiliate Allergan Finance LLC for Allergan PLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Allergan PLC (Fandel, Kent)
November 1, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Kent Michael Fandel on behalf of Defendants Actavis LLC, Allergan PLC, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc. (Fandel, Kent)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER granting #6 Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or File Dispositive Motions; Any responsive pleading or motion shall be filed ninety (90) days of the date of this Minute Order, authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
October 30, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Carolyn Robbs Bilanko on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Bilanko, Carolyn)
October 30, 2017 NOTICE TO FILER: JURY DEMAND: The Clerk has removed plaintiff's jury demand flag entered by defendant's counsel upon case opening. Plaintiff(s) counsel must now file a separate Jury Demand in order to advise the court of this request. Thank you. (RE)
October 27, 2017 Filing 6 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or File Dispositive Motions, filed by Defendants Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 10/27/2017, (Adams, Thomas)
October 26, 2017 Filing 5 LETTER from Clerk to counsel re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (RE)
October 26, 2017 Judge Thomas S. Zilly added. (RE)
October 26, 2017 NOTICE TO FILER: ATTORNEY NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE:Counsel, Emilee Sisco is not admitted to practice in the U.S. District Court, Western District of Washington. Counsel must file an Attorney Admission Petition form and register for ECF. These forms can be found under the Attorneys tab/Attorney Admissions on our courts website - wawd.uscourts.gov.If you have any questions about e-filing, registration or training, please call the ECF Support Desk at 1-866-232-9293. (RE)
October 25, 2017 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Pharmaceutical Research Associates, Inc. for The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. (Adams, Thomas)
October 25, 2017 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson (Calfo, Angelo)
October 24, 2017 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Hineline, Curt)
October 24, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 17-2-25504-1; (Receipt # 0981-5064619), filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit Part 1, #4 Exhibit Part 2)(Hineline, Curt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Seattle v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Seattle
Represented By: Peter Samuel Holmes
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Represented By: Ronald J Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: Donna M Welch
Represented By: Martin L Roth
Represented By: Jennifer G Levy
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Represented By: James Harlan Wendell
Represented By: Timothy W Knapp
Represented By: Bruce A Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Represented By: Ronald J Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Pain Center Medical Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Represented By: Ronald J Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank D. Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Donna M Welch
Represented By: Martin L Roth
Represented By: Jennifer G Levy
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Represented By: Timothy W Knapp
Represented By: Bruce A Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Represented By: Ronald J Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Represented By: Carolyn Robbs Bilanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Represented By: Ronald J Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: James Harlan Wendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank D Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: James Harlan Wendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Curt Roy Hineline
Represented By: Carolyn Robbs Bilanko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company Inc
Represented By: Andrew W. Durland
Represented By: Ronald J Friedman
Represented By: Thomas Dean Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: James Harlan Wendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Angelo J Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: James Harlan Wendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Represented By: Donna M Welch
Represented By: Martin L Roth
Represented By: Jennifer G Levy
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Represented By: Timothy W Knapp
Represented By: Bruce A Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Represented By: Brendan Thomas Mangan
Represented By: James Harlan Wendell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLC
Represented By: Donna M Welch
Represented By: Martin L Roth
Represented By: Jennifer G Levy
Represented By: Kent Michael Fandel
Represented By: Timothy W Knapp
Represented By: Bruce A Rubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seattle Pain Center Medical Corporation doing business as Seattle Pain Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?