Madison Development Group LLC v. Singelyn

Plaintiff: Madison Development Group LLC
Defendant: Michael Singelyn
Case Number: 2:2017cv01585
Filed: October 25, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Overpayment and Enforcement of Judgment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MINUTE ORDER re parties' 34 Stipulation and Order of Dismissal With Prejudice. This stipulation is self-executing. The action is DISMISSED with prejudice and without an award of costs to either party. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER re-noting Defendant Michael Singelyn's 15 MOTION for Summary Judgment to 8/15/2018. Signed by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)
February 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Madison Development Group LLC v. Singelyn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Madison Development Group LLC
Represented By: Jofrey M McWilliam
Represented By: Nicholas Ryan-Lang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Singelyn
Represented By: Lynn M Engel
Represented By: Ralph H Palumbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?