Peden v. Catholic Community Services of Western Washington, et al
Plaintiff: Craig Peden
Defendant: Catholic Community Services of Western Washington, Lifelong, Everett Housing Authority, Madison Clinic, Harborview Medical Center and Senior Terrace Apartments
Case Number: 2:2017cv01610
Filed: October 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: plaintiff at 1425 Broadway, #232, Seattle, WA 98122 via first class mail.
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 9 Motion for TRO and denying Plaintiff's 10 Motion for Appointment of Counsel. The Court DISMISSES Plaintiff's claims without prejudice, and this case is now CLOSED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file Second Amended Complaint no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Plaintiff to file an Amended Complaint within 21 days of this order, signed by Judge Chief Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 4 Emergency Motion for Injunction signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail and via voicemail message
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peden v. Catholic Community Services of Western Washington, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Peden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catholic Community Services of Western Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifelong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everett Housing Authority
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Clinic, Harborview Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Terrace Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?