Haglund v Sawant et al
Plaintiff: Carl Haglund
Defendant: Kshama Sawant and City of Seattle
Case Number: 2:2017cv01614
Filed: October 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S REMAINING CLAIMS AND DIRECTING ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT re: Plaintiff's 63 Motion to Dismiss, re: 64 Stipulated Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot Defendants' 33 Motion for Summary Judgment and Pla intiff's 62 Motion to Remand. All remaining claims asserted by Plaintiff Carl Haglund against Defendants Kshama Sawant and the City of Seattle are dismissed with prejudice and without costs or fees to any party. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting Defendants' 25 Motion for Partial Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Leave Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file his Second Amended Complaint with the Court forthwith. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER denying Plaintiff's 11 Motion for Overlength Brief. Authorized by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haglund v Sawant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kshama Sawant
Represented By: Robert B Mitchell
Represented By: Michael K Ryan
Represented By: Raina V Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Seattle
Represented By: Robert B Mitchell
Represented By: Michael K Ryan
Represented By: Raina V Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Haglund
Represented By: Bradley W Andersen
Represented By: Paul E Fogarty
Represented By: Phillip J. Haberthur
Represented By: Steve C Morasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?