Tile Tech Inc v Appian Way Sales Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tile Tech Inc
Defendant: Appian Way Sales Inc and Puget Lite-Pavers Inc
Case Number: 2:2017cv01660
Filed: November 3, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting Plaintiff's unopposed 49 Motion to extend the stay until 8/1/2018. The court strikes the current case schedule. Amended Joint Status Report due by 8/8/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting Defendants' 35 Motion to Stay Proceedings Against Puget Lite-Pavers, Inc and GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Tile Tech's request (Dkt. # 45 ) to strike certain materials in Defendants' reply. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (TH)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting the 46 Joint Motion to Stay Pending Mediation. All deadlines (with the exception of the pending Defendants' 35 Motion to Stay Proceedings Against Puget) shall be stayed until June 20, 2018 for the purpose of permitting the parties to focus their efforts on settling their dispute in mediation. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 34 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 11 Stipulated Motion for Further Extension of Time for Defendants to Answer Complaint. Deadline extended to 12/18/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
November 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 9 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Deadline extended from 12/1/2017 to 12/7/2017. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tile Tech Inc v Appian Way Sales Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tile Tech Inc
Represented By: Kelly W Cunningham(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Marc C Levy
Represented By: C. Wook Pak(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Thomas Shewmake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Appian Way Sales Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Puget Lite-Pavers Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?