Yoachim et al v. Pizza Hut, Inc.

Plaintiff: Peter Yoachim and Michelle Madeen
Defendant: Pizza Hut, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv01675
Filed: November 7, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Marsha J. Pechman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL dismissing action without prejudice per 29 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 18, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER substituting the name of the party Defendant from Pizza Hut, Inc. to Pizza Hut, LLC. The case caption shall be changed to reflect this substitution. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)
January 16, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's 24 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for Initial Disclosures. The Court grants this unopposed Motion and gives the parties until January 30, 2018 to exchange initial disclosures. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (TH)
December 7, 2017 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed 14 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Deadline extended to 1/12/2018. Signed by Judge Marsha J. Pechman. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yoachim et al v. Pizza Hut, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Yoachim
Represented By: William B Federman(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Madeen
Represented By: William B Federman(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Kim D Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pizza Hut, Inc.
Represented By: Anne M. Kelts(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Nicholas O Kennedy(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Duncan Manville
Represented By: Teresa H Michaud(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Represented By: Colin H Murray(Designation Admission Pro Hac Vice)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?