Baker v. Grant et al

Plaintiff: Jamall Baker
Defendant: Jerald Grant, Michael Clayton, Jason Neely, Holmes and Alley Butler
Case Number: 2:2017cv01678
Filed: November 8, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: Robert S. Lasnik
Referring Judge: Mary Alice Theiler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 17, 2018 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 33 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; granting defendants' 18 Motion to Dismiss, dismissing without prejudice plaintiff's amended complaint; granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's 24 Motion for Leave to Amend; de nying plaintiff's 31 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Injunction; RE-REFERRING this matter to Judge Theiler for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. **2 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jamall Baker, Prisoner ID: 338926)(SWT)
June 29, 2018 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's motions to appoint counsel (Dkts. [28 & 36 ) without prejudice. Signed by Hon. Mary Alice Theiler. **3 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jamall Baker, Prisoner ID: 338926) (TH)
June 27, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING MOTION to Magistrate Judge Mary Alice Theiler : Plaintiff's 36 MOTION for Order in Support of Motion to Appoint Counsel, by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jamall Baker, Prisoner ID: 338926)(SWT)
June 18, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERENCE re Plaintiff's 28 MOTION to Appoint Counsel; referring motion to Magistrate Judge Mary Alice Theiler. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. **1 PAGE(S), PRINT ALL**(Jamall Baker, Prisoner ID: 338926)(PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Grant et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamall Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerald Grant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alley Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?