John Doe PLLC v. Seatree PLLC et al

Plaintiff: John Doe PLLC
Defendant: Seatree PLLC and James J Namiki
Case Number: 2:2017cv01681
Filed: November 9, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Richard A Jones
Nature of Suit: Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause of Action: 18:1962
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2018 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting defendants' 71 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint; dismissing with prejudice 70 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 8, 2018 103 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's 96 , 98 Motions for Reconsideration. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
August 3, 2018 97 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. The Court GRANTS Defendants' motions for relief from deadlines, docket nos. 78 , 81 , and 85 . Plaintiff's motions for partial summary judgment, docket nos. 77 , 80 , and 83 , are STAYED, and the corresponding noting dat es are STRICKEN, pending the Court's resolution of Defendants' 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, docket no. 71 . Plaintiff's motion for relief from deadline, docket no. 75 (the "Motion for Relief"), is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion for excess pages, docket no. 91, is STRICKEN as moot. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (TH)
June 6, 2018 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting in part and deferring in part defendant's 7 Motion to Dismiss; granting plaintiff's 39 Motion for Leave to File Supplement to Original Complaint treated as a motion to amend the complaint. If ICT wishes to amend its complaint, it shall file an amended complaint within twenty-eight (28) days of this Minute Order; denying without prejudice plaintiff's 54 Motion for Declaratory Judgment. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
May 22, 2018 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's 36 Motion to Seal; denying plaintiff's 45 Motion to Seal; denying plaintiff's 48 Motion to Seal; directing plaintiff to file one supplemental brief on or before 6/1/2018 specifically indicating whether he is withdrawing the sealed documents at issue in these motions. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)
March 20, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying plaintiff's 24 Motion for an Order; directing parties to refrain from using pseudonyms when referring to any individual or entity. Authorized by Judge Thomas S. Zilly. (SWT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Doe PLLC v. Seatree PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe PLLC
Represented By: Dale R Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seatree PLLC
Represented By: Dan Kalish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James J Namiki
Represented By: Dan Kalish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?