Espinoza v. City of Seattle et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Espinoza
Defendant: The City of Seattle and Thomas Mahaffey
Case Number: 2:2017cv01709
Filed: November 13, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: James L. Robart
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2018 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking Defendants Thomas Mahaffey, The City of Seattle 48 Motion to Compel Plaintiff Daniel Espinoza to Provide Complete Responses to Defendants' Requests for Admission ; striking Defendants' 51 Motion to Compel Mr. Espinoza to Produce Certain Military Service Records and Federal Tax Returns. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT)
August 23, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 27 Motion to Amend Complaint. Amended complaint due no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this order. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
July 2, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR PROTECTION OF CONFIDENTIAL DISCOVERY DOCUMENTS signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
January 26, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREEMENT REGARDING DISCOVERY OF ELECTRONICALLY STORED INFORMATION AND ORDER re 15 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 13, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadlines: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/12/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 1/26/2018, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 2/2/2018. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)
December 5, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to 1/5/2018 for Defendant City of Seattle to serve and file its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge James L. Robart. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza v. City of Seattle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Espinoza
Represented By: Matthew Z Crotty
Represented By: Thomas G. Jarrard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Seattle
Represented By: David M. Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Mahaffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?