United States of America v. Acarregui

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Refawne L Acarregui
Case Number: 2:2017cv01782
Filed: November 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 17 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Judgment. Judgment is entered in favor of the United States on its Complaint (Dkt. # 1 ) and against Refawne L. Acarregui. The current scheduling order, Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates dated February 8, 2019 (Dkt. # 16 ), is VACATED. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) Modified on 3/21/2019: copy sent to Defendant via U.S. Mail (PM).
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting defendant's 11 Unopposed Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Richard L. Johnson and Lesourd & Patten, P.S. may withdraw from this matter and no longer represent Defendant as of the date this Order is entered. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)(Attorney Richard L Johnson terminated.) (cc: Defendant via USPS)
March 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time. Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/4/2018, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 5/11/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Acarregui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Yen Jeannette Tran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Refawne L Acarregui
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?