U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Insurance Trust v. Markov et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Insurance Trust
Defendant: Ivailo Markov, Shane Roberts, John and Jane Doe and Unknown Occupants of the Premises
Case Number: 2:2017cv01786
Filed: November 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Snohomish
Presiding Judge: John C Coughenour
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER remanding this matter to Snohomish County Superior Court.Per LCR 3(I), case will be remanded 14 days from the date of this Order, on 7/11/2018. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Ivailo Markov via first class mail)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. Within fourteen (14) days of the issuance of this order, Defendant is ORDERED to show cause why this case should not be remanded to Snohomish County Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) (cc: Defendant via first class mail)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting Defendant's 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis signed by Hon. Brian A Tsuchida.(TH) (cc: Pro Se Defendant via U.S. Mail)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Insurance Trust v. Markov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. as Trustee for LSF9 Master Insurance Trust
Represented By: Julia A Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ivailo Markov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Occupants of the Premises
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?