Salas v. PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc et al

Plaintiff: Lorenzo Santiago Salas
Defendant: PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc, Hofax Products, Inc and John Does 1-4
Case Number: 2:2017cv01787
Filed: November 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Western District of Washington
Office: Seattle Office
County: Pierce
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing all claims with prejudice and without costs re parties' 61 Stipulated Motion. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motions in Limine (Dkts. 49 , 50 ). Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying Defendants' 42 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM)
October 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying defendant PPG's 35 Motion for Protective Order, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending the Discovery Deadline re parties' 39 Stipulated Motion. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the discovery deadline set forth in the Court's Order Setting Trial Date and Related Dates (Dkt. # 11 ) is extended to October 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (TH)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Protective Order and to Quash or Modify Subpoena, signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (SWT)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting Plaintiff's 14 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Extending Deadlines. Plaintiff shall file his Proposed Amended Complaint, Dkt. # 14 -2, and serve it on Defendants within fourteen (14) days of this Order. Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2018, Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 6 Motion For Remand. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salas v. PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Santiago Salas
Represented By: Damian Salomon Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPG Architectural Finishes, Inc
Represented By: Matthew Michael Kennedy
Represented By: Richard Lawrence Martens
Represented By: Jane J. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hofax Products, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?