Barron v. Marriott International Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Kym Barron
Defendant: Does and Courtyard Management Corporation
Case Number: 2:2017cv01801
Filed: December 1, 2017
Court: Washington Western District Court
Office: Seattle Office
County: King
Presiding Judge: Ricardo S Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 31, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's Counsel's 20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Kevin Paul Smith and Defiance Law PPLC are allowed to withdraw from this matter and no longer represent Plaintiff as of the date this Order is entered. Ms. Barron will proceed pro se unless or until new counsel makes an appearance on her behalf. Signed by Judge Ricardo S. Martinez. (PM) cc: plaintiff via first class mail
July 17, 2018 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting parties' 23 Stipulated Motion to Continue Trial and Deadlines. Bench Trial **4 DAYS** continued to 2/11/2019 before Judge Ricardo S Martinez, Discovery Motions due by 8/31/2018, Discovery completed by 10/1/2018, Dispositive motions due by 11/6/2018, Motions in Limine due by 1/14/2019, Pretrial Order due by 1/30/2019, Trial briefs to be submitted by 2/6/2019. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
July 12, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying the parties' 18 Stipulated Motion for Extension of Deadlines. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
March 9, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 16 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
February 5, 2018 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Second Joint Motion to Extend Initial Disclosure Related Deadlines. Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/9/2018, Combined Joint Status Report and Discovery Plan due by 2/16/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez.(PM)
January 22, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Joint Motion to Extend Initial Disclosure Deadlines: FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 1/26/2018, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 2/2/2018, Joint Status Report due by 2/9/2018. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (PM)
December 20, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting parties' 6 Stipulated Motion of Dismissal of Marriott International, Inc. and Substitution of Proper Defendant; All claims against Defendant Marriott International, Inc. are DISMISSED without prejudice. Courtyard Management Corporation is added as a Defendant in this action and substituted in place of Defendant Marriott International, Inc. Signed by Judge Ricardo S Martinez. (TH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Washington Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barron v. Marriott International Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kym Barron
Represented By: Kevin Paul Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtyard Management Corporation
Represented By: John Bradley Bigos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?